EP3632369 - METHOD FOR INCORPORATING PHOTOGRAPHIC FACIAL IMAGES AND/OR FILMS OF A PERSON INTO THE PLANNING OF ODONTOLOGICAL AND/OR COSMETIC DENTAL TREATMENTS AND/OR THE PREPARATION OF RESTORATIONS FOR SAID PERSON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIRONA Dental Systems GmbH Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | For all designated states DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc. Susquehanna Commerce Center 221 West Philadelphia Street, 60W York, 17401-2991 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kucharczyk, Ronny Dompfelderring 29 67551 Worms / DE | 02 /
Hauth, Steffen Taunusstraße 55 55246 Mainz-Kostheim / DE | 03 /
Koza, André Friedensstr. 44 64653 Lorsch / DE | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Özer, Alpdeniz Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Corporate Legal Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2022/06] |
Former [2020/15] | Özer, Alpdeniz Dentsply Sirona Legal IP Department Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 18198342.0 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632369 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3632369 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, A61C9/00, G06T7/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A61C13/0004 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/24 (US);
A61C9/004 (EP,KR);
A61C9/0053 (EP,KR,US);
G06F30/12 (US);
G06T17/00 (US);
G16H30/00 (KR);
G16H30/20 (US);
G16H40/20 (US);
G16H40/67 (US);
G16H50/50 (KR);
H04N23/64 (US);
G06T1/0007 (KR);
G06T2200/08 (US);
G06T2207/30036 (KR);
G06T2210/41 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] |
Former [2020/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION VON FOTOGRAFISCHEN GESICHTSBILDERN UND/ODER FILMEN EINER PERSON IN DIE PLANUNG VON ODONTOLOGISCHEN UND/ODER KOSMETISCHEN ZAHNBEHANDLUNGEN UND/ODER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZAHNERSÄTZEN FÜR DIE BESAGTE PERSON | [2020/15] | English: | METHOD FOR INCORPORATING PHOTOGRAPHIC FACIAL IMAGES AND/OR FILMS OF A PERSON INTO THE PLANNING OF ODONTOLOGICAL AND/OR COSMETIC DENTAL TREATMENTS AND/OR THE PREPARATION OF RESTORATIONS FOR SAID PERSON | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'INCORPORER DES IMAGES FACIALES PHOTOGRAPHIQUES ET/OU DES FILMS D'UNE PERSONNE DANS LA PLANIFICATION DE TRAITEMENTS DENTAIRES ODONTOLOGIQUES ET/OU COSMÉTIQUES ET/OU LA PRÉPARATION DE RESTAURATIONS DE LADITE PERSONNE | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 08.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2022
02.06.2022
ADMISSIBLE ULLRICH & NAUMANN Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Schneidmühlstraße 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2022/27] | 23.11.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.06.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2018 | AL | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | ES | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | IT | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | NL | 09.02.2022 | PL | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SE | 09.02.2022 | SI | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | TR | 09.02.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | NO | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | IE | 02.10.2022 | LU | 02.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 02.10.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 02.10.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.10.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2010145898 (MALFLIET KATJA [BE], et al) [X] 1-2,10-13,15 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0062] *[Y] 3-9,14; | [XY]US2013166312 (LAUCIELLO FRANK [US], et al) [X] 1-2,10-13,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-9,14; | [XY]US2014379356 (SACHDEVA ROHIT [US], et al) [X] 1-2,10-13,15 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0109] * [Y] 3-9,14; | [XY]US2017319293 (FISKER RUNE [DK]) [X] 1-2,10-13,15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] * [Y] 3-9,14 | Examination | US2018181737 | by applicant | US2017049311 | DE102015222782 | Opposition | US2013166312 | US2017319293 | US2018125610 | - Dental Shooting, "Dental Shooting: TUTORIAL 3/3 TIPS & TRICKS (MOBILE DENTAL PHOTOGRAPHY)", Youtube, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=QaJ0O-g8MFE, XP055932072 |