EP3632499 - PROGRAMMABLE DRAINAGE VALVE WITH FIXED REFERENCE MAGNET FOR DETERMINING DIRECTION OF FLOW OPERABLE WITH ANALOG OR DIGITAL COMPASS TOOLSETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integra LifeSciences Switzerland Sàrl Rue Girardet 29 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODEN, JR., Thomas c/o Integra LifeSciences Corporation 311 Enterprise Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
D'AOUST, Patricia c/o Integra LifeSciences Corporation 311 Enterprise Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 03 /
ARAZAWA, Alexander c/o Integra LifeSciences Corporation 311 Enterprise Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/17] |
Former [2020/15] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18198474.1 | 03.10.2018 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632499 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3632499 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A61M27/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] |
Former [2020/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROGRAMMIERBARES DRAINAGEVENTIL MIT FESTEM REFERENZMAGNET ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER DURCHFLUSSRICHTUNG, DAS MIT ANALOGEN ODER DIGITALEN KOMPASSWERKZEUGSÄTZEN BETRIEBEN WERDEN KANN | [2020/15] | English: | PROGRAMMABLE DRAINAGE VALVE WITH FIXED REFERENCE MAGNET FOR DETERMINING DIRECTION OF FLOW OPERABLE WITH ANALOG OR DIGITAL COMPASS TOOLSETS | [2020/15] | French: | SOUPAPE DE DRAINAGE PROGRAMMABLE AVEC AIMANT FIXE DE RÉFÉRENCE PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LA DIRECTION D'ÉCOULEMENT UTILISABLE AVEC DES BOÎTES À OUTILS DE COMPAS NUMÉRIQUE OU ANALOGIQUE | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 05.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1092450 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 3 - column 27, line 39; figures 1-9C *; | [X]US2014336560 (HAKIM CARLOS A [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 176; figures 1-47 *; | [A]EP3002030 (DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-5* column 1, line 5 - column 7, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2018126147 (HAKIM CARLOS A [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 23, paragraph 224; figures 1A-48 *; | [X]US2018184943 (BODEN JR THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 69; figures 1-17 * | by applicant | US4595390 | US8322365 |