EP3636795 - THICK, LOW-STRESS TETRAHEDRAL AMORPHOUS CARBON COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanofilm Technologies International Pte Ltd Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent 02-02/03/04 Ayer Rajah Industrial Estate Singapore 139959 / SG | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Schlich, George Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18199423.7 | 09.10.2018 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636795 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/02, C23C14/06, C23C14/32, C23C16/26, C23C28/04, C23C28/00, F16J9/26 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
C23C14/025 (EP,US);
C23C14/325 (EP,CN,US);
C23C14/0605 (CN,US);
C23C14/0611 (EP);
C23C16/26 (EP);
C23C28/044 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICKE, SPANNUNGSARME TETRAEDRISCHE AMORPHE KOHLENSTOFFBESCHICHTUNGEN | [2020/16] | English: | THICK, LOW-STRESS TETRAHEDRAL AMORPHOUS CARBON COATINGS | [2020/16] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS DE CARBONE AMORPHE TÉTRAHÉDRIQUE ÉPAIS ET À FAIBLE CONTRAINTE | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/45] | 27.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6461731 (VEERASAMY VIJAYEN S [US], et al); | [A]US7402350 (VEERASAMY VIJAYEN [US], et al); | [A]US2014178637 (RAJAGOPALAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2018019940 (MAHLE METAL LEVE S/A [BR], et al); | by applicant | WO2009151404 | WO2009151403 |