EP3473781 - VAPOUR RETARDER AS WELL AS INSULATED FLAT ROOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/17] | FLAT ROOF INSULATION AS WELL AS SYSTEM FOR THE THERMAL INSULATION OF FLAT ROOFS | ||
[2024/21] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Isover Les Miroirs 18 avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROMENTIN, Charlotte 57 Boulevard Saint-Michel 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
SAUVET, Katherine 143 rue d'Alésia 75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
BARNASSON, Eric 15 Allée Buffon 94700 Maisons Alfort / FR | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Agnes-Bernauer-Straße 88 80687 München / DE | [2024/41] |
Former [2019/17] | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Elsenheimerstraße 49 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18200631.2 | 16.10.2018 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | FR20170059823 | 19.10.2017 Original published format: FR 1759823 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473781 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473781 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04D12/00, E04D13/16, E04B1/76, E04D11/02 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
E04D13/1637 (EP);
E04B1/7658 (EP);
E04D11/02 (EP);
E04D12/002 (EP);
E04D13/1625 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | E04D13/16, E04B1/76, E04D11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DAMPFBREMSE SOWIE GEDÄMMTES FLACHDACH | [2024/21] | English: | VAPOUR RETARDER AS WELL AS INSULATED FLAT ROOF | [2024/21] | French: | PARE-VAPEUR AINSI QUE TOIT PLAT ISOLÉ | [2024/21] |
Former [2019/17] | FLACHDACHDÄMMUNG SOWIE SYSTEM ZUR WÄRMEDÄMMUNG VON FLACHDÄCHERN | ||
Former [2019/17] | FLAT ROOF INSULATION AS WELL AS SYSTEM FOR THE THERMAL INSULATION OF FLAT ROOFS | ||
Former [2019/17] | ISOLATION DE TOIT PLAT AINSI QUE SYSTÈME D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE DE TOITS PLATS | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 21.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]EP0821755 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [XY]DE10111319 (OEKOLOGISCHE BAUSYSTEME B I MO [DE]); | [XY]DE102004059812 (DOERKEN EWALD AG [DE]); | [XY]EP2554758 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]); | [XY]EP2759403 (SILU VERWALTUNG AG [CH]); | [IY]EP3162980 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) |