EP3477052 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPRESSOR WITH A NON-AXISYMMETRIC PROFILE OF AN INTER-BLADE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/18] | NON-AXISYMMETRIC HOUSING PROFILE FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPRESSOR | ||
[2020/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Aero Boosters SA Route de Liers, 121 4041 Herstal / BE | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIERNAUX, Stéphane 3, rue des hirondelles 4680 Oupeye / BE | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2021/16] |
Former [2019/18] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 18200940.7 | 17.10.2018 | [2019/18] | Priority number, date | BE20170005766 | 26.10.2017 Original published format: BE 201705766 | [2019/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3477052 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3477052 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F04D29/32, F04D29/54, F04D29/68 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
F01D5/143 (EP,US);
F01D5/02 (US);
F04D29/321 (EP,US);
F04D29/329 (US);
F04D29/542 (EP,US);
F04D29/681 (EP,US);
F05D2220/3217 (US);
F05D2240/24 (US);
F05D2250/611 (EP,US);
F05D2250/711 (US);
F05D2250/712 (US);
F05D2250/73 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2019/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMPRESSOR EINES GASTURBINENMOTORS MIT EINEM NICHT-AXIALSYMMETRISCHEN PROFIL EINER ZWISCHENSCHAUFELFLÄCHE | [2020/26] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPRESSOR WITH A NON-AXISYMMETRIC PROFILE OF AN INTER-BLADE SURFACE | [2020/26] | French: | COMPRESSEUR DE TURBOMACHINE AYANT UN PROFIL NON-AXISYMÉTRIQUE DE SURFACE INTER-AUBES | [2020/26] |
Former [2019/18] | NICHT-AXIALSYMMETRISCHES PROFIL EINES GEHÄUSES FÜR EINEN KOMPRESSOR EINES GASTURBINENMOTORS | ||
Former [2019/18] | NON-AXISYMMETRIC HOUSING PROFILE FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPRESSOR | ||
Former [2019/18] | PROFIL NON-AXISYMÉTRIQUE DE CARTER POUR COMPRESSEUR DE TURBOMACHINE | Examination procedure | 31.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 31.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2018 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | ES | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | IT | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | IE | 17.10.2021 | LU | 17.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.10.2018 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 17.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 17.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 17.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012201692 (BOSTON ERIC JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [I]US2013136619 (PASSRUCKER HARALD [DE], et al) [I] 1-10,12-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1, 4, 6-8 *; | [ID]FR3011888 (SNECMA [FR]) [ID] 1-15 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 3 * * page 6, line 31 - page 11, line 22 * * figures 1a-3d *; | [A]US2015107265 (SMITH PAUL KENDALL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] ** figure 3 * | by applicant | FR3011888 |