EP3640620 - METHOD FOR DETECTING THE COURSE OF AN UNDERGROUND PIPELINE BY MEANS OF AN AIRBORNE DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Birchbauer, Josef Alois Heidenreichstr. 9/13 8054 Seiersberg / AT | 02 /
Liepe, Mike Meisenweg 1 91334 Hemhofen / DE | 03 /
Weiss, Roland Görlitzer Str. 12 91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Windisch, Claudia Köppling 149 8565 St. Johann / AT | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18201166.8 | 18.10.2018 | [2020/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640620 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01M5/00, F16L55/00, G01B21/08, G01C21/00, G01V3/16 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
G01M5/0025 (EP);
G01B21/08 (EP);
G01C15/002 (EP);
G01C7/02 (EP);
G01M5/0075 (EP);
G01V3/16 (EP);
G01V3/165 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION DES VERLAUFS EINER UNTERIRDISCH VERLEGTEN ROHRLEITUNG MITTELS EINER LUFTGESTÜTZTEN ERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING THE COURSE OF AN UNDERGROUND PIPELINE BY MEANS OF AN AIRBORNE DETECTION DEVICE | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DU PASSAGE D'UNE CONDUITE SOUTERRAINE AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION AÉRIEN | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001035836 (MICELI GILBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2017108609 (HADDY ALAN [US]) [X] 1,2,5,10,11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-6 * [I] 1-14; | [A]EP3228980 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2017299755 (COLE SCOTT B [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-7 * [I] 1-14; | [A]DE102016223774 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]DE102016015194 (TRACTO TECHNIK [DE]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2018292374 (DITTBERNER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0080]; figures 1-9 *; | [I] - XIAOQIAN HUANG ET AL, "Variant PID controller design for autonomous visual tracking of oil and gas pipelines via an unmanned aerial vehicle", 2017 17TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONTROL, AUTOMATION AND SYSTEMS (ICCAS), INSTITUTE OF CONTROL, ROBOTICS AND SYSTEMS - ICROS, (20171018), doi:10.23919/ICCAS.2017.8204467, pages 368 - 372, XP033269408 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23919/ICCAS.2017.8204467 | [A] - KUMAR, "A LiDAR and IMU Integrated Indoor Navigation System for UAVs and Its Application in Real-Time Pipeline Classification", SENSORS, CH, (20170602), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.3390/s17061268, ISSN 1424-8220, page 1268, XP055579799 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s17061268 | [A] - YOUNGJUN CHOI ET AL, "A Framework for Unmanned Aerial Systems Selection and Trajectory Generation for Imaging Service Missions", 2018 AVIATION TECHNOLOGY, INTEGRATION, AND OPERATIONS CONFERENCE, AIAA - AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS, RESTON, VA, US, (20180625), vol. 6, no. AIAA 2018-4244, doi:10.2514/6.2018-4244, ISBN 978-1-62410-556-2, page 16pp, XP009512537 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2514/6.2018-4244 |