EP3467756 - WIRELESS TAG FOR TIME SLOT COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SES-imagotag GmbH Kalsdorferstraße 12 8072 Fernitz-Mellach / AT | [2019/37] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states SES-imagotag GmbH St.-Peter-Gürtel 10b 8042 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rößl, Andreas SES-imagotag GmbH Kalsdorferstrasse 12 8072 Fernitz-Mellach / AT | 02 /
Hechenblaickner, Andreas SES-imagotag GmbH Kalsdorferstrasse 12 8072 Fernitz-Mellach / AT | 03 /
Frießnegg, Christian SES-imagotag GmbH Kalsdorferstrasse 12 8072 Fernitz-Mellach / AT | [2019/49] |
Former [2019/15] | 01 /
Rößl, Andreas SES-imagotag GmbH St. Peter Gürtel 10b A-8042 Graz / AT | ||
02 /
Hechenblaickner, Andreas SES-imagotag GmbH St. Peter Gürtel 10b A-8042 Graz / AT | |||
03 /
Frießnegg, Christian SES-imagotag GmbH St. Peter Gürtel 10b A-8042 Graz / AT | Representative(s) | Schneider, Michael Tailorpatent Schulweg 8/3/8 2340 Mödling / AT | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 18201448.0 | 20.02.2014 | [2019/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467756 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3467756 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06K7/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G06K7/10029 (EP,RU,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
H04L7/08 (RU);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2019/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FUNK-TAG FÜR ZEITSCHLITZKOMMUNIKATION | [2019/15] | English: | WIRELESS TAG FOR TIME SLOT COMMUNICATION | [2019/15] | French: | ÉTIQUETTE RFID POUR LA COMMUNICATION PAR TRANCHE DE TEMPS | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 12.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14707354.8 / EP3108429 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2014 | AL | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | ES | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | IT | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | LU | 20.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.02.2014 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0710916 (ESSELTE METO INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 6 * * page 5, line 15 - line 47 * * page 6, line 3 - line 14 * * figures 1, 6 *; | [A]EP0921460 (NCR INT INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]WO03073261 (PRICER AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - line 22 * * page 4, line 6 - line 25 * * page 8, line 5 - line 21 *; | [AD]WO2010004349 (ZBD DISPLAYS LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 9, line 23 - page 11, line 20 * * page 12, line 12 - page 17, line 21 * * page 19, line 10 - line 13 ** page 42, line 21 - page 43, line 9 *; | [A]US2012326846 (TSENG LINCOLN [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0076] * | by applicant | DE4439074 | WO2010004349 |