EP3502844 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RESETTING PILOTING SYMBOLOGY OF AN AIRCRAFT ON A WORN HEAD-UP DISPLAY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE REAL WORLD OUTSIDE VIA AN SVS SYNTHETIC VISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales TOUR CARPE DIEM Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANILLE, Thierry 2 allée des Cèdres 33700 MERIGNAC / FR | 02 /
MAULET, Daniel 11 rue Vercors 26320 SAINT MARCEL LES VALENCE / FR | 03 /
LEMOINE, Olivier 365 chemin des Îles 26300 JAILLANS / FR | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Tanguy, Yannick, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriete Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18201556.0 | 19.10.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | FR20170001340 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1701340 | [2019/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502844 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502844 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G01C23/00, F41G3/22, G02B27/01 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP,IL);
G09G5/38 (IL,US);
B64D43/00 (CN);
G01C21/1656 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G01C23/005 (CN);
G01S19/47 (CN);
G02B27/01 (US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,IL,US);
G01C23/00 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0141 (IL,US);
G02B2027/0187 (EP);
G09G2340/0464 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR NEUEINSTELLUNG EINER SYMBOLOGIE ZUM STEUERN EINES LUFTFAHRZEUGS AUF EINEM BORD-HEAD-UP-DISPLAY, DAS DIE REALE AUSSENWELT ÜBER EIN SYNTHETIC VISION SYSTEM (SVS-SYSTEM) KONFORM ANZEIGT | [2019/26] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RESETTING PILOTING SYMBOLOGY OF AN AIRCRAFT ON A WORN HEAD-UP DISPLAY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE REAL WORLD OUTSIDE VIA AN SVS SYNTHETIC VISION SYSTEM | [2019/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE RECALAGE D'UNE SYMBOLOGIE DE PILOTAGE D'UN AERONEF SUR UN AFFICHEUR TETE HAUTE PORTE CONFORME AVEC LE MONDE REEL EXTERIEUR VIA UN SYSTEME DE VISION SYNTHETIQUE SVS | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 17.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2018 | AL | 27.05.2020 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | IE | 19.10.2020 | LU | 19.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.10.2018 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009081177 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015165838 (THALES SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A] - TUCERYAN M ET AL, "Single point active alignment method (SPAAM) for optical see-through HMD calibration for AR", AUGMENTED REALITY, 2000. (ISAR 2000). PROCEEDINGS. IEEE AND ACM INTERN ATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MUNICH, GERMANY 5-6 OCT. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20001005), doi:10.1109/ISAR.2000.880938, ISBN 978-0-7695-0846-7, pages 149 - 158, XP010520324 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISAR.2000.880938 | [A] - JANIN A L ET AL, "Calibration of head-mounted displays for augmented reality applications", VIRTUAL REALITY ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, 1993., 1993 IEEE SEATTLE, WA, USA 18-22 SEPT. 1, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19930918), doi:10.1109/VRAIS.1993.380772, ISBN 978-0-7803-1363-7, pages 246 - 255, XP010130485 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VRAIS.1993.380772 |