EP3473835 - TWO STAGE OXYGEN REMOVAL FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINE FUEL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHODEN, William E. 137 Farmcliff Drive Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 02 /
PADYKULA, Peter J. 95 Tower Hill Brimfield, MA 01010 / US | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/48] |
Former [2019/17] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18201792.1 | 22.10.2018 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | US201715789252 | 20.10.2017 Original published format: US201715789252 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473835 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473835 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/22, F02C9/36 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
F02C7/22 (EP,US);
F02C7/236 (US);
B01D53/22 (US);
B64D37/005 (US);
F02C7/232 (US);
F02C9/36 (EP,US);
F05D2220/323 (EP,US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
F05D2260/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2019/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGE SAUERSTOFFENTFERNUNG FÜR DAS KRAFTSTOFFSYSTEM EINES GASTURBINENMOTORS | [2019/17] | English: | TWO STAGE OXYGEN REMOVAL FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINE FUEL SYSTEM | [2019/17] | French: | ÉLIMINATION D'OXYGÈNE EN DEUX ÉTAPES POUR UN SYSTÈME DE CARBURANT DE MOTEUR DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 24.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2018 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | ES | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | TR | 01.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 22.10.2018 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.10.2018 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.10.2018 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6315815 (SPADACCINI LOUIS J [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 53 * * figure 9 *; | [A]US2006263277 (TILLMAN THOMAS G [US], et al) [A] 1-6,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008173003 (CHEN ALEXANDER G [US]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0016] , [ 0019] ** figures 1-3 * |