EP3459574 - SLIDE-ACTIVATED ANGLED INSERTER FOR INTRADERMAL DRUG INFUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/13] | SLIDE-ACTIVATED ANGLED INSERTER AND CANTILEVERED BALLISTIC INSERTION FOR INTRADERMAL DRUG INFUSION | ||
[2024/07] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONSTANTINEAU, Cole 44 Aberdeen Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 02 /
SCHOONMAKER, Ryan 1579 Corte Daniel Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | 03 /
BRUEHWILER, Michel 14 Erie Avenue Newton, NJ 02461 / US | 04 /
BENE, Eric 1 Waitt Road Lynn, MA 01902 / US | [2024/13] |
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
CONSTANTINEAU, Cole 44 Aberdeen Avenue Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02138 / US | ||
02 /
SCHOONMAKER, Ryan 1579 Corte Daniel Oceanside, CA California 92056 / US | |||
03 /
BRUEHWILER, Michel 14 Erie Avenue Newton, NJ New Jersey 02461 / US | |||
04 /
BENE, Eric 1 Waitt Road Lynn, MA Massachusetts 01902 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 18201959.6 | 24.11.2011 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | US201034496810P | 30.11.2010 Original published format: US 34496810 P | US201034496910P | 30.11.2010 Original published format: US 34496910 P | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459574 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/158 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A61M5/158 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABGEWINKELTER, DURCH SCHIEBEN AKTIVIERTER EINSETZER ZUR INTRADERMALEN MEDIKAMENTENINFUSION | [2024/07] | English: | SLIDE-ACTIVATED ANGLED INSERTER FOR INTRADERMAL DRUG INFUSION | [2024/07] | French: | INTRODUCTEUR INCLINÉ ACTIVÉ PAR GLISSEMENT POUR UNE PERFUSION DE MÉDICAMENT PAR VOIE INTRADERMIQUE | [2024/07] |
Former [2019/13] | ABGEWINKELTER, DURCH SCHIEBEN AKTIVIERTER EINSETZER UND FREISCHWEBENDER BALLISTISCHER EINSATZ ZUR INTRADERMALEN MEDIKAMENTENINFUSION | ||
Former [2019/13] | SLIDE-ACTIVATED ANGLED INSERTER AND CANTILEVERED BALLISTIC INSERTION FOR INTRADERMAL DRUG INFUSION | ||
Former [2019/13] | INTRODUCTEUR INCLINÉ ACTIVÉ PAR GLISSEMENT ET INSERTION BALISTIQUE EN PORTE-À-FAUX POUR UNE PERFUSION DE MÉDICAMENT PAR VOIE INTRADERMIQUE | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 27.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11190475.1 / EP2457604 | EP16202145.5 / EP3167922 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9510313 (WIKLUND ERNST S G F [SE]) [X] 15 * pages 1, 4, 5; figure 1 * [A] 16,17; | [A]EP1475113 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 15-17* figures 7-8 *; | [X]US2006173410 (MOBERG SHELDON B [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1698279 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007140632 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2445437 (APPLIED MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2009103759 (UNOMEDICAL AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 13 - page 33 * | by applicant | US2006173410 | WO2007140632 | GB2445437 | WO2009103759 |