EP3474135 - UNIVERSAL APPLICATION FRAMEWORK FOR STREAMLINED FRONTEND DEVELOPMENT OF USER INTERFACE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Open Text Software GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Ring 20 85630 Grasbrunn/München / DE | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephan, Florian Alex-Gugler Str. 39 83666 Waakirchen / DE | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 18202111.3 | 23.10.2018 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | US201762575617P | 23.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762575617 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474135 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3474135 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/38, G06F9/451 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,US);
G06F9/448 (US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06F9/4843 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLER ANWENDUNGSRAHMEN FÜR OPTIMIERTE FRONTEND-ENTWICKLUNG VON BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENANWENDUNGEN | [2019/17] | English: | UNIVERSAL APPLICATION FRAMEWORK FOR STREAMLINED FRONTEND DEVELOPMENT OF USER INTERFACE APPLICATIONS | [2019/17] | French: | STRUCTURE D'APPLICATIONS UNIVERSEL POUR LE DÉVELOPPEMENT FRONTAL RATIONALISÉ D'APPLICATIONS D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 23.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.01.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3188009 (SAP SE [DE]) |