EP3453511 - COINJECTION HOT RUNNER INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mold-Masters (2007) Limited 233 Armstrong Avenue Georgetown, ON L7G 4X5 / CA | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ten, Valery 5014 Des Jardines Drive Burlington, Ontario L7L 7L7 / CA | 02 /
Fairy, Fabrice 57 Mahogany Forest Drive Vaughan, ON L6A0T1 / CA | 03 /
Babin, Dennis 39 Early Street Georgetown, Ontario L7G 5W8 / CA | 04 /
Gammon, Scott P.O. Box N1E 2W6 67 Grove street Guelph, Ontario / CA | [2019/15] |
Former [2019/11] | 01 /
Ten, Valery 5014 Des Jardines Drive Burlington, Ontario L7L 7L7 / CA | ||
02 /
Fairy, Fabrice Rue du Pere Umbricht 67200 Strasbourg / FR | |||
03 /
Babin, Dennis 39 Early Street Georgetown, Ontario L7G 5W8 / CA | |||
04 /
Gammon, Scott P.O. Box N1E 2W6 67 Grove street Guelph, Ontario / CA | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 18202496.8 | 21.09.2011 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | US201038498410P | 21.09.2010 Original published format: US 38498410 P | US201039141210P | 08.10.2010 Original published format: US 39141210 P | US201040594910P | 22.10.2010 Original published format: US 40594910 P | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453511 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453511 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16, B29C45/17, B29C45/28 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B29C45/1735 (EP,US);
B29C45/20 (US);
B29C45/1603 (EP,US);
B29C45/1607 (US);
E02B3/06 (US);
E02B3/066 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOINJEKTIONS-HEISSKANAL-SPRITZGUSSSYSTEM | [2019/11] | English: | COINJECTION HOT RUNNER INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEM | [2019/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION À CANAUX CHAUDS DE COINJECTION | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 13.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11826278.1 / EP2618982 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2011 | AL | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | ES | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | TR | 16.09.2020 | IE | 21.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | FR | 16.11.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | GB | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/33] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
MT | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MT | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3947177 (ECKARDT HELMUT) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 10 *; | [A]US4717324 (SCHAD ROBERT D [CA], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE102006040182 (MHT MOLD & HOTRUNNER TECH AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [A]JP2010012605 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 5, 6 * | by applicant | US7527490 |