EP3453480 - METHOD OF JOINING BY LASER WELDING TOGETHER A PLURALITY OF WELDING ALUMINIUM OBJECTS AND CORRESPONDING WELDING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471 8571 / JP | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HISADA, Kohei c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
OGURA, Shuhei c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
MAKINO, Junichiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
OGUSU, Kazuyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
NAKATA, Masahiro c/o TOYOTA MOTOR EAST JAPAN, INC. 1 Chuodaira, Ohira-mura Kurokawa-gun, Miyagi 981-3609 / JP | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 18202628.6 | 21.04.2015 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | JP20140088091 | 22.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014088091 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453480 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/32, B23K26/22, // B23K101/18, B23K103/10 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B23K26/22 (EP,US);
B23K26/20 (CN,KR);
B23K26/244 (KR);
B23K26/32 (EP,US);
B23K33/00 (CN);
B23K2101/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | SCHWEISSVERFAHREN ZUM LASERSCHWEISSEN MEHRERER ALUMINIUM WERKSTÜCKE UND ENTSPRECHENDE SCHWEISSSTRUKTUR | [2019/11] | English: | METHOD OF JOINING BY LASER WELDING TOGETHER A PLURALITY OF WELDING ALUMINIUM OBJECTS AND CORRESPONDING WELDING STRUCTURE | [2019/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE PAR LASER DE PLUSIEURS OBJETS EN ALUMINIUM, ET STRUCTURE SOUDÉE CORRESPONDANTE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 12.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15164364.0 / EP2952284 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06155058 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1,4* abstract *; | [Y]JP2001062575 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0011]; figures 1a-b *; | [Y]US2006011592 (WANG PEI-CHUNG [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0031]; figure - *; | [Y]WO2013098621 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,6,7 * paragraphs [0068] - [0069]; figure - * | by applicant | JP2009233712 | EP2952284 |