EP3647899 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A VALVE, RELATED ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT AND VALVE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNZMANN, Rolf Büchetweg 13 76593 Gernsbach / DE | 02 /
PETRY, Karl-Heinz Mühlestr. 2d 8864 Reichenburg / CH | 03 /
HUBER, Wolfgang Luzernerstrasse 74c 6333 Hünenberg See / CH | 04 /
HUWILER, Adrian Obergütschstrasse 6 6038 Honau / CH | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18203215.1 | 29.10.2018 | [2020/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3647899 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/06 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
G05D7/0635 (EP,US);
F16K37/0083 (EP,US);
F16K37/0075 (EP);
F16K37/0091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES VENTILS, ZUGEHÖRIGE ELEKTRONISCHE ANSTEUEREINHEIT UND VENTILANTRIEB | [2020/19] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A VALVE, RELATED ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT AND VALVE DRIVE | [2020/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE SOUPAPE, UNITÉ DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE ASSOCIÉE ET ENTRAÎNEMENT DE SOUPAPE | [2020/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/16] | 30.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0264032 (BOPP & REUTHER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,12,13 * column 1, line 34 - line 47 * * column 5, line 15 - line 45 * * claims 1-13 * * figure 1 * [A] 3-11 [Y] 2; | [XA]WO9506276 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * page 3, line 1 - line 24 * * page 13, line 15 - page 14, line 5 * * page 15, line 1 - line 25 * * figures 2-4 *[A] 3-11; | [XAY]US2009240376 (ELSHAFEI MOUSTAFA [SA], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 3-11 [Y] 2 | by applicant | DE4019503 | WO2010010092 |