EP3648465 - A METHOD FOR GENERATING A UNIQUE EVENT IDENTIFIER FOR AN EPG EVENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Digital Broadcast S.A. Route de Lausanne 319 1293 Bellevue / CH | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polak, Michal ADB Polska Sp. z o.o. ul. Trasa Polnocna 16 65-119 Zielona Gora / PL | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18203234.2 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3648465 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3648465 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2362, H04N21/262, H04N21/434 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
H04N21/2362 (EP);
H04N21/26283 (EP);
H04N21/4345 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EIN VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER EINDEUTIGEN EREIGNISKENNUNG FÜR EIN EREIGNIS EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN PROGRAMMFÜHRERS | [2020/19] | English: | A METHOD FOR GENERATING A UNIQUE EVENT IDENTIFIER FOR AN EPG EVENT | [2020/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR GÉNÉRER UN IDENTIFIANT D'ÉVÉNEMENT UNIQUE POUR UN ÉVÉNEMENT DU GUIDE DE PROGRAMME ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/19] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 27.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2018 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | ES | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | IT | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | TR | 15.09.2021 | IE | 30.10.2021 | LU | 30.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 30.10.2018 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.10.2018 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002059636 (TAKEUCHI KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 2, 5 ** paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] *; | [A]US2010088734 (DEWA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0039] , [0 70] *; | [A]WO2014121818 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 2-7, 9 * * page 2, line 7 - line 31 * * page 8, line 10 - page 19, line 27 * |