EP3483043 - MUDGUARDS WITH FLAPS FOR MOUNTING ON VEHICLES, PREFERABLY TRUCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Sauermann GmbH & Co. KG Lauterbacherweg 2 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauermann, Franz c/o Franz Sauermann GmbH & Co. KG Lauterbacherweg 2 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 18203499.1 | 30.10.2018 | [2019/20] | Priority number, date | DE201710126119 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017126119 | [2019/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483043 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3483043 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/18, B62D25/16 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
B62D25/188 (EP);
B62D25/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | KOTFLÜGEL MIT SPRITZLAPPEN ZUR MONTAGE AN FAHRZEUGEN, BEVORZUGT LASTKRAFTWAGEN | [2019/20] | English: | MUDGUARDS WITH FLAPS FOR MOUNTING ON VEHICLES, PREFERABLY TRUCKS | [2019/20] | French: | GARDE-BOUE À BAVETTES DESTINÉE AU MONTAGE SUR DES VÉHICULES, DE PRÉFÉRENCE DES POIDS LOURDS | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 14.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2018 | AL | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | MT | 14.10.2020 | NL | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | RS | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | TR | 14.10.2020 | IE | 30.10.2020 | LU | 30.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | NO | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.10.2018 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MT | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
TR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | DK | 14.10.2020 | |
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | LV | 14.10.2020 | |
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 14.10.2020 | |
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 14.10.2020 | |
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | PT | 15.02.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2931304 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [X] 2 * page 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 4, paragraph 5 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,3-15; | [A]EP0109577 (KOEVER H KOTFLUEGEL [DE]) [A] 1,4-15 * page 1, lines 1-3 * * page 5, line 17 - page 7, line 24 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2001213358 (KONDO TOMIO) [A] 1,3,10* figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2006208476 (COLLINS RODNEY [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,10-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] * * figures 1-5 *; | [XA]CN205661548U (NINGBO BENYE METAL COMPONENTS CO LTD) [X] 2 * figure 1 * [A] 1,3-15 |