EP3495355 - LABELED INHIBITORS OF PROSTATE SPECIFIC MEMBRANE ANTIGEN (PSMA), THEIR USE AS IMAGING AGENTS AND PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | For all designated states Ruprecht-Karls-Universität Heidelberg Grabengasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eder, Matthias Seckenheimer Hauptstr. 95 68239 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Kopka, Klaus Hauptstr. 60a 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 03 /
Schäfer, Martin Am Pfaffenrain 19 69239 Neckarsteinach / DE | 04 /
Bauder-Wüst, Ulrike Im Klingen 7 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 05 /
Haberkorn, Uwe Königsäcker 82 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | 06 /
Eisenhut, Michael Schloss Wolfsbrunnenweg 33a 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 07 /
Benesova, Martina Am Paffenrain 19 69239 Neckarsteinach / DE | 08 /
Mier, Walter Brückenweg 21 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Kilger, Ute Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/24] | Application number, filing date | 18203547.7 | 17.10.2014 | [2019/24] | Priority number, date | EP20130004991 | 18.10.2013 Original published format: EP 13004991 | EP20140175612 | 03.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14175612 | [2019/24] | Previously filed application, date | WO2014EP02808 | 17.10.2014 | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3495355 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/145, C07B59/00, A61K51/04, A61P35/00, C07D257/02 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
A61K51/0402 (EP,IL,US);
C07D295/145 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K51/0482 (IL,US);
A61K51/04 (IL,KR);
A61K51/044 (IL,KR);
A61K51/0497 (EP,IL,US);
A61P13/08 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P35/04 (EP,IL);
C07B59/002 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D257/02 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/574 (IL,KR);
G01N33/60 (IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Extension states | BA | 30.10.2018 | Title | German: | MARKIERTE INHIBITOREN DES PROSTATASPEZIFISCHEN MEMBRANANTIGENS (PSMA), DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS KONTRASTMITTEL UND PHARMAZEUTIKA ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATAKREBS | [2019/24] | English: | LABELED INHIBITORS OF PROSTATE SPECIFIC MEMBRANE ANTIGEN (PSMA), THEIR USE AS IMAGING AGENTS AND PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER | [2019/24] | French: | INHIBITEURS MARQUÉS DE L'ANTIGÈNE MEMBRANAIRE SPÉCIFIQUE DE LA PROSTATE (PSMA), LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS D'IMAGERIE ET AGENTS PHARMACEUTIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2019/24] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 31.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14799340.6 / EP3038996 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 27.11.2018 | Stay of proceedings | [2019/30] | 27.11.2018 | Stay of proceedings | [2022/13] | 02.05.2022 | Resumption of proceedings | [2022/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2013022797 (MOLECULAR INSIGHT PHARM INC [US], et al); |