EP3479855 - DEVICE FOR EXTRACORPOREAL BLOOD TREATMENT WITH GRAVIMETRIC BALANCING AND ULTRAFILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Avitum AG Schwarzenberger Weg 73-79 34212 Melsungen / DE | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEGER, Jennifer Oberer Weinberg 15 34212 Melsungen / DE | 02 /
WEISER, Markus Promenadeweg 39 2384 Breitenfurt / AT | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2019/19] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 18204411.5 | 05.11.2018 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | DE201710125962 | 07.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017125962 | [2019/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3479855 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3479855 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/16 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
A61M1/1635 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/1605 (CN,US);
A61M1/1611 (US);
A61M1/1621 (CN);
A61M1/1637 (US);
A61M1/1641 (US);
A61M1/1643 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/332 (US);
A61M2205/3334 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR EXTRAKORPORALEN BLUTBEHANDLUNG MIT GRAVIMETRISCHER BILANZIERUNG UND MÖGLICHKEIT ZUR ULTRAFILTRATION | [2019/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR EXTRACORPOREAL BLOOD TREATMENT WITH GRAVIMETRIC BALANCING AND ULTRAFILTRATION | [2019/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DU SANG EXTRACORPOREL À COMPTABILISATION GRAVIMÉTRIQUE ET À POSSIBILITÉ D'ULTRAFILTRATION | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 17.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2018 | AL | 17.03.2021 | CY | 17.03.2021 | CZ | 17.03.2021 | DK | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | ES | 17.03.2021 | FI | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | MK | 17.03.2021 | MT | 17.03.2021 | NL | 17.03.2021 | PL | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SI | 17.03.2021 | SK | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | BG | 17.06.2021 | NO | 17.06.2021 | GR | 18.06.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | PT | 19.07.2021 | IE | 05.11.2021 | LU | 05.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 05.11.2018 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 05.11.2018 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | CZ | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | CZ | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
NO | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5344568 (KITAEVICH YULI [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 5, lines 4-31,66 - column 6, lines 1-30 *; | [X]EP1590017 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]) [X] 1-13* paragraphs [0088] , [0089] , [0091] - [0093] - [0106] , [0109] , [0110]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1684825 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0063]; figures 30,31 *; | [X]US2013012914 (BURBANK JEFFREY H [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0061] , [0079] - [0083]; figures 14,15 *; | [X]US2015060362 (POUCHOULIN DOMINIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0174]; figures 1,2 * |