EP3479977 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF WALL COMPONENTS FOR BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Binder Beteiligungs AG Zillertalstr. 39 6263 Fügen / AT | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binder, Mattheo Johannes Schanzlgasse 5 6263 Fügen / AT | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 18204556.7 | 06.11.2018 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | DE201710125829 | 06.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017125829 | [2019/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3479977 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3479977 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B27M3/00, B27B5/06, E04C2/12, E04B1/10, B27M1/08, // E04B1/348 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
B27M1/08 (EP,US);
E04B2/70 (US);
B27B5/06 (EP,US);
B27M3/0026 (EP,US);
B65D9/34 (US);
E04B1/00 (US);
E04B1/10 (EP,US);
E04B1/34815 (EP,US);
E04B1/34838 (US);
E04B1/34869 (EP,US);
E04C2/12 (EP,US);
E04C2/24 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | B27M3/00, B27B5/06, E04C2/12, E04B2/00, // E04B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WANDBAUTEILEN FÜR GEBÄUDE | [2019/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF WALL COMPONENTS FOR BUILDING | [2019/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSANTS MURAUX POUR BÂTIMENTS | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 21.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB936135 (ALFRED MATTHIAS SIEGMUND SCHUD) [I] 1-7 * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 81; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP2618972 (WEINIG MICHAEL AG [DE]) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-6 * | Examination | EP2618972 |