EP3501384 - METHOD FOR FLUORESCENCE-BASED IMAGING AND MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Health Network 101 College Street Suite 150 Toronto, Ontario M5G 1L7 / CA | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DACOSTA, Ralph Sebastian Suite 2409 21 Carlton Street Toronto, Ontario M5G 1L7 / CA | 02 /
WILSON, Brian C. 85 Indian Grove Toronto, Ontario M6R 2Y6 / CA | 03 /
ZHANG, Kai 6153 Nineteenth Avenue Markham, Ontario L3P 3J3 / CA | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/29] |
Former [2019/26] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18205726.5 | 20.05.2009 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | US20085478008P | 20.05.2008 Original published format: US 5478008 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3501384 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3501384 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3501384 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01N21/64 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/0071 (US);
A61B5/01 (US);
A61B5/445 (EP,US);
A61B5/72 (US);
A61B5/742 (US);
G01N21/6456 (EP,US);
G01N21/6486 (EP,US);
A61B10/00 (EP,US);
A61B5/0042 (EP,US);
A61B5/4519 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6471 (EP,US);
G01N21/6408 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0221 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2019/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDGEBUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG AUF FLUORESZENZBASIS | [2019/26] | English: | METHOD FOR FLUORESCENCE-BASED IMAGING AND MONITORING | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR IMAGERIE ET SURVEILLANCE PAR FLUORESCENCE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 16.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09749361.3 / EP2291640 | Divisional application(s) | EP24180824.5 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9421816 (ENVIROCON INT INC [US], et al); | [Y]US5474910 (ALFANO ROBERT R [US]); | [I]US5981958 (LI NING [US], et al); | [I]WO0025114 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE], et al); | [Y]WO02055729 (SCHIES URSULA [DE], et al); | [I]US6603552 (CLINE RICHARD W [CA], et al); | [Y]US2003160182 (PETRICH JACOB W [US], et al); | [Y]US2006008866 (FLICK RICKY L [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006007715 (UMEDIK INC [CA], et al); | [I]EP1912059 (BASF SE [DE]) |