EP3483814 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING BLOCK CHAIN-BASED MULTIFACTOR PERSONAL IDENTITY VERIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black Gold Coin, Inc. 7495 Azure Dr. Suite 100 Las Vegas, Nevada 89130 / US | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrade, Marcus 7495 Azure Drive, Suite 100 Las Vegas, Nevada 89130 / US | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 18206468.3 | 29.03.2016 | [2019/20] | Priority number, date | US201615083241 | 28.03.2016 Original published format: US201615083241 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483814 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/36, G06Q20/38, H04L29/06 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
H04L63/0861 (EP,CN,EA,FI,GB,IL,KR,NO,RU,US);
H04L9/0637 (EA,SE);
H04L9/0866 (FI);
G06F16/00 (EA,RU,SE);
H04L9/06 (DK,EA);
G06F21/41 (CN,EA);
G06Q20/36 (DK,EA,HU);
G06F21/30 (US);
G06F21/31 (US);
G06F21/32 (CN,EA,GB);
G06F21/35 (EA,RU);
G06F21/40 (EA,FI);
G06Q20/38 (DK,EA,HU);
G06Q20/3827 (EA,KR);
G06Q20/3829 (EA,KR);
G06Q20/40145 (EA,FI,GB,KR);
H04L63/08 (EA,US);
H04L9/006 (EA);
H04L9/3231 (EA,FI,GB);
H04L9/3236 (EA,FI,SE);
G06Q20/065 (EA,GB);
H04L2463/082 (EP,CN,EA,GB,IL,NO,US);
H04L2463/102 (EA,GB);
H04L63/00 (EA,US);
H04L9/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG BLOCKKETTENBASIERTER MULTIFAKTORIELLER PERSÖNLICHER IDENTITÄTSPRÜFUNG | [2019/20] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING BLOCK CHAIN-BASED MULTIFACTOR PERSONAL IDENTITY VERIFICATION | [2019/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FOURNITURE D'UNE VÉRIFICATION D'IDENTITÉ PERSONNELLE MULTIFACTORIELLE BASÉE SUR UNE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 15.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16897290.9 / EP3400541 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015324789 (DVORAK JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2015183901 (HARRIS MICHAEL RICHARDS [US], et al) |