EP3461818 - POLYMORPHIC FORMS OF NILOTINIB HYDROCHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. 8-2-337 Road No. 3 Banjara Hills Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500 034 / IN | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peddy, Vishweshwar Plot No. 341 Vasavi Colony Green Hills Road No. 1 Saroornagar, Andhra Pradesh 500035 Hyderabad / IN | 02 /
Chennuru, Ramanaiah c/o Krishna Reddy Pinnama Reddy B.N. Kandriga vi po md Chittore dist Andhra Pradesh 517645 / IN | 03 /
Ramakrishnan, Srividya H.No: 1005/2A SMR Vinay City Miyapur Andhra Pradesh Hyderabad 500049 / IN | [2019/41] |
Former [2019/21] | 01 /
Peddy, Vishweshwar Plot No. 341 Vasavi Colony Green Hills Road No. 1 Saroornagar, Andhra Pradesh 500035 Hyderabad / IN | ||
02 /
Chennuru, Ramanaiah Sulluru pet (MDL) Nellore (Dt) Andhra Pradesh 524121 Velagala Ponnuru / IN | |||
03 /
Ramakrishnan, Srividya H.No: 1005/2A SMR Vinay City Miyapur Andhra Pradesh Hyderabad 500049 / IN | |||
Former [2019/14] | 01 /
Peddy, Vishweshwar Plot No. 341 Vasavi Colony Green Hills Road No. 1 Saroornagar, Andhra Pradesh 500035 Hyderabad / IN | ||
02 /
Chennuru, Ramanaiah Sulluru pet (MDL) Nellore (Dt) Andhra Pradesh 524121 Velagala Ponnuru / IN | |||
03 /
Ramakrishnan, Srividya H.No: 1005/2A SMR Vinay City Miyapur Andhra Pradesh Hyderabad / IN | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/14] | Application number, filing date | 18206745.4 | 23.04.2014 | [2019/14] | Priority number, date | IN2013CHE1795 | 24.04.2013 Original published format: IN 1795CH2013 | [2019/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3461818 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A61K31/506, A61P35/02 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | POLYMORPHE FORMEN VON NILOTINIB HYDROCHLORID | [2019/14] | English: | POLYMORPHIC FORMS OF NILOTINIB HYDROCHLORIDE | [2019/14] | French: | FORMES POLYMORPHES D'HYDROCHLORURE DE NILOTINIB | [2019/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 01.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14787984.5 / EP2989090 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007015871 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-7* figure -; example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2010009402 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [I] 1-7 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2011033307 (GENERICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-7 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2011086541 (GENERICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-7 * figure -; example -; claim - * | by applicant | WO2007015871 | WO2007015870 | WO2010054056 | WO2011086541 | WO2011163222 | WO2012055351 | WO2012070062 | US2013210847 | - IP.com Journal, (20100000), vol. 10, no. 3B, page 11 | - IP com Journal, (20100000), vol. 10, no. 12A, page 18 | - IP.com Journal, (20090000), vol. 9, no. 12B, page 14 | - IP.com Journal, (20100000), vol. 10, no. 5A, page 25 | - IP.com Journal, (20100000), vol. 10, no. 7B, page 3 |