EP3490127 - A SWITCHED CAPACITOR VOLTAGE CONVERTER FOR A RECHARGEABLE BATTERY IN A HEARING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUDNASON, Gunnar c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 02 /
JENSEN, Rasmus Glarborg c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 03 /
CHRISTENSEN, Jess c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 04 /
CHRISTENSEN, Kåre Tais c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Demant Demant A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | William Demant Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Application number, filing date | 18207185.2 | 20.11.2018 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | EP20170204102 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17204102 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490127 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/15, H02M3/07, // H02M1/00 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
H02M1/15 (EP,US);
H02M1/44 (US);
H02M3/06 (US);
H02M3/07 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (US);
H02M1/0054 (EP,US);
H02M3/072 (EP,US);
H04R2225/33 (US);
H04R2225/51 (US);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHALTETER KONDENSATORSPANNUNGSWANDLER FÜR EINE WIEDERAUFLADBARE BATTERIE IN EINEM HÖRGERÄT | [2019/22] | English: | A SWITCHED CAPACITOR VOLTAGE CONVERTER FOR A RECHARGEABLE BATTERY IN A HEARING AID | [2019/22] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE TENSION À CONDENSATEUR COMMUTÉ POUR UNE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE DANS UNE PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 29.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2001038279 (JAWORSKI FRANK B [US]) [X] 1-6,8-10,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1,9,11 * [I] 7,11-14; | [A]JP2005020922 (TOKO INC) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]EP2991214 (SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENTS IND [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * |