EP3657623 - NETWORK SYSTEM FOR HYBRID AC/DC GRIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Ltd Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitt, Susanne Langer Anger 117 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Giuntoli, Marco Neugasse 5 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18207443.5 | 21.11.2018 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657623 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02J5/00, G06Q50/06 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
H02J5/00 (EP,CN,US);
H02J4/00 (CN,US);
G05B13/042 (US);
H02J3/00 (US);
G06Q50/06 (EP);
H02J2203/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NETZWERKSYSTEM FÜR HYBRIDE WECHSELSTROM/GLEICHSTROM-NETZE | [2020/22] | English: | NETWORK SYSTEM FOR HYBRID AC/DC GRIDS | [2020/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU POUR GRILLES HYBRIDES CA/CC | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 24.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015134132 (FENG XIAOMING [US], et al) [X] 1,10,12,13 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2016048150 (CHIANG HSIAO-DONG [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 7,11; | [A] - ROGER WIGET ET AL, "Probabilistic security constrained optimal power flow for a mixed HVAC and HVDC grid with stochastic infeed", 2014 POWER SYSTEMS COMPUTATION CONFERENCE, (20140801), doi:10.1109/PSCC.2014.7038408, ISBN 978-83-935-8013-2, pages 1 - 7, XP055288293 [A] 7,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PSCC.2014.7038408 |