EP3473154 - AUTONOMOUS FLOOR CLEANING WITH A REMOVABLE PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Ping-Hong 40 Woodbine Terrace Auburndale, MA Massachusetts 02468 / US | 02 /
FORAN, Dan 5 Alma St., Apt.4 San Francisco, CA California 94117 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Marcus 24 Concord Road Watertown, MA Massachusetts 02472 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Joe 409 Railroad Ave Norwood, MA 02062 / US | 05 /
GRAZIANI, Andrew 4 Alyssa Drive Derry, NH New Hampshire 03038 / US | [2020/32] |
Former [2019/17] | 01 /
LU, Ping-Hong 40 Woodbine Terrace Auburndale, MA Massachusetts 02468 / US | ||
02 /
FORAN, Dan 5 Alma St., Apt.4 San Francisco, CA California 94117 / US | |||
03 /
WILLIAMS, Marcus 24 Concord Road Watertown, MA Massachusetts 02472 / US | |||
04 /
JOHNSON, Joe 120 Walpole Street Norwood, MA Massachusetts 02062 / US | |||
05 /
GRAZIANI, Andrew 4 Alyssa Drive Derry, NH New Hampshire 03038 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/17] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18207860.0 | 13.08.2015 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | US201514658820 | 16.03.2015 Original published format: US201514658820 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473154 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473154 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/06, A47L9/28, A47L11/40 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A47L11/4044 (EP,KR,US);
A47L9/0673 (EP,KR,US);
A47L11/4061 (KR,US);
A47L11/4066 (EP,KR,US);
A47L9/2805 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2201/00 (EP,US);
A47L2201/04 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | AUTONOME FUSSBODENREINIGUNG MIT HERAUSNEHMBAREM PAD | [2019/17] | English: | AUTONOMOUS FLOOR CLEANING WITH A REMOVABLE PAD | [2019/17] | French: | NETTOYAGE DE SOLS AUTONOME AVEC UN TAMPON AMOVIBLE | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 22.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15180917.5 / EP3069644 | Divisional application(s) | EP20189186.8 / EP3785590 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2015 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | IE | 13.08.2020 | LU | 13.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.08.2015 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IE | 13.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
IE | 13.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19545242 (HAKO GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 1 - line 12 *; | [A]WO0182766 (PERSONAL ROBOTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XA]US2013247938 (WALZ JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-29 * [A] 2-14; | [A]EP2762051 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0218]; figures 1-13 * |