EP3489200 - BEVERAGE SUPPLEMENTATION DEVICE, BEVERAGE DISPENSER HAVING THE BEVERAGE SUPPLEMENTATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A BEVERAGE DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riprup Company S.A. 37, Le Pollet GY1 St. Peter Port / GG | [2020/27] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Riprup Company S.A. 37 Le Pollet St. Peter Port GY1 1WQ / GG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bissen, Monique Erlenweg 12 75175 Pforzheim / DE | 02 /
Schucker, Josef Via Ronco 52 6622 Ronco Sopra Ascona / CH | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Wittmann, Günther Patentanwaltskanzlei Wittmann Frans-Hals-Straße 31 81479 München / DE | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 18207971.5 | 23.11.2018 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | EP20170203425 | 23.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17203425 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489200 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/68, B67D1/00, // C02F1/44 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
B67D1/0034 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A47J31/00 (CN);
A47J31/40 (CN);
A47J31/402 (CN);
A47J31/4403 (CN);
A47J31/46 (CN);
B67D1/004 (EP,US);
B67D1/07 (US);
C02F1/68 (EP,US);
C02F1/685 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
B67D2001/075 (US);
B67D2210/0001 (EP,US);
B67D2210/00013 (EP,US);
B67D2210/0006 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/686 (EP,US);
C02F2307/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUGABE VON NAHRUNGSERGÄNZUNGSMITTELN, GETRÄNKESPENDER MIT EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR VERWENDUNG DES GETRÄNKESPENDERS | [2019/22] | English: | BEVERAGE SUPPLEMENTATION DEVICE, BEVERAGE DISPENSER HAVING THE BEVERAGE SUPPLEMENTATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A BEVERAGE DISPENSER | [2019/22] | French: | APPAREIL D'ADDITION DE MINÉRAUX DANS UNE BOISSON, DISTRIBUTEUR DE BOISSONS COMPRENANT UN TEL APPAREIL ET MÉTHODE POUR UTILISER UN TEL DISTRIBUTEUR | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 25.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/16] | 13.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006021919 (OLSON JUDD D [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5-17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202010000286U (AQUA LOHAS WATER TECH SERVICE [TW]) [A] 1,2,5-17* the whole document *; | [XI]FR3012123 (HEINEKEN ENTPR [FR]) [X] 5,11,13 * page 15, line 11 - page 16, line 13; figure 3 * [I] 1,2,6-10,12,14-17; | [XI]US2017088410 (WING MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0095] - [0098]; figures 7,8 * [I] 5-17 |