EP3493095 - CONNECTION UNIT AND METHOD FOR ACCESS CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elischer, Anna Panoramastraße 70 72622 Nürtingen / DE | For all designated states Elischer, Marie Panoramastraße 70 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elischer, Otto Panoramastraße 70 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Christ, Niko Geitz Patentanwälte PartG mbB Obere Wässere 3-7 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Christ Patentanwälte PartGmbB Obere Wässere 3-7 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 18208146.3 | 23.11.2018 | [2019/23] | Priority number, date | DE201710128655 | 04.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017128655 | [2019/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3493095 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3493095 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/74, G06F21/85, G06F21/81 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
G06F21/85 (EP);
G06F21/74 (EP);
G06F21/81 (EP);
G06F2221/2137 (EP);
G06F2221/2151 (EP);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] |
Former [2019/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUGRIFFSSTEUERUNG | [2019/23] | English: | CONNECTION UNIT AND METHOD FOR ACCESS CONTROL | [2019/23] | French: | UNITÉ DE CONNEXION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ACCÈS | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 07.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | MT | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | RS | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | IE | 23.11.2020 | LU | 23.11.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MT | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.11.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.11.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.11.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.11.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.11.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | DK | 14.10.2020 | |
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | LV | 14.10.2020 | |
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 14.10.2020 | |
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 14.10.2020 | |
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | PT | 15.02.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1521158 (FUJITSU SIEMENS COMPUTERS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011] *; | [A]EP1990751 (SECUNET SECURITY NETWORKS AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract ** paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0019] *; | [XI]WO2017008860 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * page 6, line 18 - line 34 * * page 13, line 9 - line 11 * [I] 2-12,14-18; | [I]DE102015111534 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0050] * |