EP3656614 - SMART LICENSE PLATE AND TRAFFIC INFORMATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alsuhaibani, Younes Suliman A. Al Rube Alkhali Street P.O. Box 93160 Riyadh / SA | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 18208203.2 | 26.11.2018 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3656614 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/10, G08G1/00 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
B60R13/10 (EP);
G08G1/0112 (EP);
G08G1/0129 (EP);
G08G1/017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES NUMMERNSCHILD UND VERKEHRSINFORMATIONSSYSTEM | [2020/22] | English: | SMART LICENSE PLATE AND TRAFFIC INFORMATION SYSTEM | [2020/22] | French: | PLAQUE D'IMMATRICULATION INTELLIGENTE ET SYSTÈME D'INFORMATION DE TRAFIC | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 27.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004189493 (ESTUS JAY M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0063]; figure - * [Y] 6,7,13; | [Y]US2018186309 (BATTEN DEAN [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0219]; figure - * | by applicant | US5105179 | US4001822 | US5608391 | US5657008 | US6025784 | US2002101332 |