EP3657152 - SAMPLE FOR MEASURING PARTICLES, SAMPLE CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR MEASURING PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/22] | SAMPLE FOR MEASURING PARTICLES, SAMPLE CONTAINER AND METHODS FOR MEASURING PARTICLES | ||
[2023/18] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OHB System AG Universitätsallee 27-29 28359 Bremen / DE | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2023/34] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states OHB System AG Universitätsallee 27-29 28359 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Axel St -Georg Platz 5 83624 Otterfing / DE | 02 /
Kreck, Guido 80686 München / DE | 03 /
Holzapfel, Yvonne 80686 München / DE | [2023/35] |
Former [2020/22] | 01 /
Müller, Axel St -Georg Platz 5 83624 Otterfing / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 18208262.8 | 26.11.2018 | [2020/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657152 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657152 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/22, G01N15/06, G01N15/00 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G01N1/2208 (EP);
G01N1/2214 (EP);
G01N15/0612 (EP);
G01N2001/2223 (EP);
G01N2015/0046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROBE ZUR PARTIKELMESSUNG, PROBENBEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR PARTIKELMESSUNG | [2023/18] | English: | SAMPLE FOR MEASURING PARTICLES, SAMPLE CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR MEASURING PARTICLES | [2023/18] | French: | ÉCHANTILLON DE MESURE DE PARTICULES, RÉCIPIENT D'ÉCHANTILLON ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE PARTICULES | [2020/22] |
Former [2020/22] | PROBE ZUR PARTIKELMESSUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR PARTIKELMESSUNG | ||
Former [2020/22] | SAMPLE FOR MEASURING PARTICLES, SAMPLE CONTAINER AND METHODS FOR MEASURING PARTICLES | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 28.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/24] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005214745 (RYAN SCOTT [US]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraphs [0020] , [0029] , [0030]; figure 3 *; | [XYI]US2005266415 (RYAN SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0027] - paragraphs [0039] , [0066] - [0068]; figures 5,15,2 * [Y] 5-7,10,15-19 [I] 3,4,9,11; | [A]WO2007009863 (WYSSEN HANS [CH]) [A] 19* Seite 2, letzter Absatz - Seite 3, erster Absatz *; | [Y]WO2017099100 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 10,15-19 * paragraphs [0031] , [0113] , [0116] , [0177] *; | [X] - Anonymous, "Makler Counting Chamber", (20171114), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20171114100338/http://www.sefimedical.com/makler1.htm, (20190604), XP055594068 [X] 1 * Seite 1, Absatz: Build-in grid; Abbildung auf Seite 2 * | Examination | US2006176492 | WO2006116356 | by applicant | US5271264 | US5412221 | US5635403 | US5870186 | US6122053 | US2003235926 | US2008297798 |