EP3492833 - REFRIGERATING CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku 108-8215 Tokyo / JP | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Takahide c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku TOKYO, 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Takuya c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku TOKYO, 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
UMAKOSHI, Kiyoteru c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku TOKYO, 108-8215 / JP | 04 /
TERAOKA, Masahiro c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku TOKYO, 108-8215 / JP | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 18208458.2 | 27.11.2018 | [2019/23] | Priority number, date | JP20170230452 | 30.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017230452 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492833 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/32 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
F24F13/222 (EP);
F24F13/30 (EP);
F24F13/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLKREISVORRICHTUNG | [2019/23] | English: | REFRIGERATING CYCLE DEVICE | [2019/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CYCLE DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2016099039 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1-22 * [I] 2; | [X]JPS62143129U (N.N.) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [X]JPH0989302 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]JP2007147250 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]JP2016142277 (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * figures 1-10 *; | [X]WO2017175520 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 4 *; | [XI]JP2008309430 (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 3 * figures 1-17 * [I] 4 | by applicant | JPH094876 |