EP3489456 - CUTTING ELEMENT FORMED OF POLYCRYSTALLINE DIAMOND COMPACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES, A GE COMPANY, LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEMPATI, Chaitanya, K. 130 Autumn Forest Ln Conroe, TX Texas 77384 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Suresh, G. 3 North Lansdowne Circle The Woodlands, TX Texas 77382 / US | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18209202.3 | 14.09.2012 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | US201161535618P | 16.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161535618 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489456 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/573, C23C16/27, C23C16/04, C23C16/32, C23C16/34, C23C16/50 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
E21B10/5735 (EP,US);
C23C16/045 (EP,US);
C23C16/042 (EP,US);
C23C16/27 (EP,US);
C23C16/32 (EP,US);
C23C16/342 (EP,US);
C23C16/50 (EP,US);
C23C16/56 (US);
E21B10/567 (EP,US);
C22C2204/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEELEMENTE ENTHALTENT EINEM POLYKRISTALLINEN DIAMANTPRESSLING | [2019/22] | English: | CUTTING ELEMENT FORMED OF POLYCRYSTALLINE DIAMOND COMPACT | [2019/22] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS DE COUPE FORMÉS D'UNE PASTILLE DE DIAMANT POLYCRISTALLIN | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/21] | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12831696.5 / EP2756153 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4764434 (ARONSSON SVEN B [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4; example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]WO0028106 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]) [Y] 3 * page 7, line 34 - page 11, line 27; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1318969 (CAMCO INT UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081]; figure 12 *; | [XY]US2010243337 (SCOTT DANNY E [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-6; claims 1-8 * [Y] 3 | by applicant | US6800383 | WO2008099220 | US7776256 | US7802495 |