EP3495282 - PACKAGE FOR A PLURALITY OF PRODUCTS, IN PARTICULAR CONFECTIONERY PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soremartec S.A. 16, Route de Trèves 2633 Senningerberg / LU | [2020/11] |
Former [2019/24] | For all designated states Soremartec S.A. FBC Complexe B Rue de Trèves 2632 Findel / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARPINELLO, Sara via Pierino Belli, 13 I-12051 Alba / IT | 02 /
ROSELLA, Marco Via Raddusa, 13 I-10098 Rivoli / IT | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Frontoni, Stefano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Frontoni, Stefano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 18209629.7 | 30.11.2018 | [2019/24] | Priority number, date | DE201720107355U | 04.12.2017 Original published format: DE 202017107355 U | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3495282 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/42, B65D83/04 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
B65D5/724 (EP,US);
B65D83/0454 (EP,BR,US);
B65D5/00 (RU);
B65D25/38 (US);
A63F3/00261 (BR);
A63F5/048 (EP,US);
A63F9/001 (EP,US);
A63F9/0098 (US);
A63F9/18 (US);
B65D25/04 (US);
B65D5/4204 (EP,US);
B65D5/503 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG FÜR EINE VIELZAHL VON PRODUKTEN, INSBESONDERE SÜSSWAREN | [2019/24] | English: | PACKAGE FOR A PLURALITY OF PRODUCTS, IN PARTICULAR CONFECTIONERY PRODUCTS | [2019/24] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR UNE PLURALITÉ DE PRODUITS, EN PARTICULIER DES PRODUITS DE CONFISERIE | [2019/24] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 02.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3227127 (ROBERT GAYLE); | [Y]WO9406398 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al); | [XYI]US5322166 (CROWTHER JONATHAN M [US]); | [Y]DE202012005117U (K & RCARON IVANEK MILAN [CZ]) |