EP3492892 - THERMAL PATTERN SENSOR WITH PYROELECTRIC CAPACITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENWADIH, Mohammed 5 avenue du Général de Gaulle 94500 CHAMPIGNY SUR MARNE / FR | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18209895.4 | 03.12.2018 | [2019/23] | Priority number, date | FR20170061599 | 04.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1761599 | [2019/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492892 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/04, G01J5/02, G01J5/06, G01J5/34, G01J5/08, G01J5/00 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
G01J5/046 (EP,US);
H10N19/00 (EP,US);
G01J5/0025 (EP,US);
G01J5/024 (EP,US);
G01J5/061 (EP,US);
G01J5/34 (EP,US);
G06V40/12 (US);
G06V40/1306 (EP,US);
H10N15/15 (US);
G01J2005/345 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCHER MUSTERSENSOR MIT PYROELEKTRISCHER KAPAZITÄT | [2019/23] | English: | THERMAL PATTERN SENSOR WITH PYROELECTRIC CAPACITY | [2019/23] | French: | CAPTEUR DE MOTIF THERMIQUE A CAPACITE PYROELECTRIQUE | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 25.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0862038 (KANEBO LTD) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0010] *; | [Y]WO2016024503 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 3-6 * paragraph [0041] *; | [XY]US2016276569 (ALIANE ABDELKADER [FR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0047] , [0 48]; figure 1d * [Y] 8; | [XY]FR3044409 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9-15 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 19; figure 2 * [Y] 3-6,8; | [Y] - TAN K S ET AL, "Pyroelectricity enhancement of PVDF nanocomposite thin films doped with ZnO nanoparticles", SMART MATERIALS AND STRUCTURES, IOP PUBLISHING LTD., BRISTOL, GB, vol. 23, no. 12, doi:10.1088/0964-1726/23/12/125006, ISSN 0964-1726, (20141016), page 125006, (20141016), XP020274387 [Y] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0964-1726/23/12/125006 | [Y] - NAVID A ET AL, "Purified and porous poly(vinylidene fluoride-trifluoroethylene) thin films for pyroelectric infrared sensing and energy harvesting", SMART MATERIALS AND STRUCTURES, IOP PUBLISHING LTD., BRISTOL, GB, (20100501), vol. 19, no. 5, ISSN 0964-1726, page 55006, XP020175676 [Y] 8 * the whole document * | [Y] - BAVISKAR PRASHANT KISHOR ET AL, "Controlled synthesis of ZnO nanostructures with assorted morphologies via simple solution chemistry", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (20121022), vol. 551, doi:10.1016/J.JALLCOM.2012.10.052, ISSN 0925-8388, pages 233 - 242, XP028963075 [Y] 3-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jallcom.2012.10.052 |