EP3501320 - OUTSOLE HAVING SLIP-PROOF PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, ES, RO, SK | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caprice Schuhproduktion GmbH & Co. KG Blocksbergstrasse 158 66955 Pirmasens / DE | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CÖLSCH, Jürgen Am Nussbaum 12 66954 Pirmasens / DE | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 18210005.7 | 04.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | DE201720107867U | 22.12.2017 Original published format: DE 202017107867 U | [2019/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501320 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3501320 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/22, A43B13/26, A43B13/14, // A43B13/18, A43C15/16, A43B13/04 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
A43B13/223 (EP);
A43B13/22 (EA);
A43B13/26 (EP);
A43B13/04 (EP);
A43B13/16 (EP);
A43B13/184 (EP);
A43C15/162 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A43B13/22, A43B13/04, // A43B13/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSSENSOHLE DIE RUTSCHFESTE EIGENSCHAFTEN AUFWEIST | [2019/26] | English: | OUTSOLE HAVING SLIP-PROOF PROPERTIES | [2019/26] | French: | SEMELLE EXTÉRIEURE PRÉSENTANT DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES ANTIDÉRAPANTES | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 05.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2424463 (CLAIRE HOGG ELSIE) [A] 1-6,9-14,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2116487 (DASSLER) [A] 1,3,5-10,13,16 * page 3, paragraph 1 ** page 7, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *; | [XAI]US2011247243 (EDER COLLIN K [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-11,13,14,16 * the whole document * [A] 7 [I] 4,12; | [XAI]US2012260535 (TSANG PATTY W [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,12-16 * the whole document * [A] 8,11 [I] 6; | [XAI]US2015208755 (RUSTAM ERNIE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13,15,16 * paragraphs [0032] - [0044]; figures 1-4 * [A] 4,8,11,12 [I] 5,6,14; | [XAI]US2016037857 (FOXEN THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13,14,16 * paragraphs [0095] - [0126]; figures 17-38 * [A] 8,11,12,15 [I] 4-6; | [IA]WO2016097606 (DAMART SERVIPOSTE [FR]) [I] 1-6,9,10,13,16 * page 7, line 19 - page 15, line 17; figures 1-6 * [A] 7,8,11,14 | by applicant | DE969455 |