EP3663370 - SOLVENT-CONTAINING COMPOSITION FOR A 2K COATING SYSTEM AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAW SE Rossdörfer Strasse 50 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENZEL, Stefan Im Grossen Garten 16 63110 Rodgau / DE | 02 /
DANIEL, André Am Berg 14 64397 Modautal / DE | 03 /
OTTENS, Stephan Am Kirchberg 15 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | [2023/38] |
Former [2020/24] | 01 /
Stefan Menzel Im Grossen Garten 16 63110 Rodgau / DE | ||
02 /
André Daniel Am Berg 14 64397 Modautal / DE | |||
03 /
Stephan Ottens Am Kirchberg 15 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18210057.8 | 04.12.2018 | [2020/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663370 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3663370 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/04, C08L101/10 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
C09D175/04 (EP);
C08G18/289 (EP);
C08G18/42 (EP);
C08G18/4288 (EP);
C08G18/44 (EP);
C08G18/73 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D201/10, C08K5/01, C08K5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LÖSEMITTELHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EIN 2K-BESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2020/24] | English: | SOLVENT-CONTAINING COMPOSITION FOR A 2K COATING SYSTEM AND ITS USE | [2020/24] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT UN SOLVANT POUR UN SYSTÈME DE REVÊTEMENT 2K ET SON UTILISATION | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 10.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2020 | Observations by third parties | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2021 | Observations by third parties | 19.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 12.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2013023478 (PAIMORE CO LTD) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0165]; example 15 *; | [I]EP2617778 (JOTUN AS [NO]) [I] 1-18* paragraph [0083]; claim 1 * | other | JP2013023478 | EP2617778 | - Anonymous, "Vorläufiges Technisches Merkblatt WorléePur VP Si 1012 (VP-W 2671/13) Art. Nr. 113503-20828", Worlée-Chemie GmbH, (20170411), pages 1 - 2, XP055764886 | - Anonymous, "Vorläufiges Technisches Merkblatt WorléePur VP Si 1011 (VP-W 2671/11) Art. Nr. 113503-20827", Worlée-Chemie GmbH, (20170411), pages 1 - 2, XP055764887 | - Anonymous, "Vorläufiges Technisches Merkblatt WorléePur Si VP-W 2700/13 Art. Nr. 113503-21154", Worlée-Chemie GmbH, (20170928), pages 1 - 2, XP055764889 | - Vorläufiges Technisches Merkblatt WorléePur VP Sl 4021 (VP W 2700/13) Art. Nr. 113503-21154, "Anonymous", Worlée-Chemie GmbH, (20180315), pages 1 - 2, XP055764893 | - Anonymous, "Vorläufiges Technisches Merkblatt WorléePur VP Si 1021 (VP-W 2671/37) Art. Nr. 113503-21616", Worlée-Chemie GmbH, (20180305), pages 1 - 2, XP055764894 | - Anonymous, "Dow Solvents and Additives for Coatings", Dow Chemical Company, (20171100), pages 1 - 19, XP055764896 | - Anonymous, "Schnell trocknender, früh belastbarer, chemisch resistenter 2 K Decklack, seidenglänzend, auf Basis eines Alkydbasierten silanfunktionellen Polyurethans", Worlée-Chemie GmbH, (20171000), page 1, XP055764898 | - Anonymous, "KRONOS 2360 Titanium Dioxide", Kronos International, Inc.,, (20160000), page 1, XP055764901 | - Anonymous, "Produktinformation Acematt TS100", Acematt, pages 1 - 2 | - Anonymous, "SYLOSIV® Molecular Sieve Powder", Grace, page 8pp | - Ange Wiegand, Lars Ossenschmidt, "festkörperrreiche, silanfunktionelle Polyurethane für vielfältige Anwendungen", VILF-Jahrestagung 2017, (20171116), pages 1 - 22, 2pp, XP055764907 | - Anonymous,, "Product Data Sheet: NACURE® 4000 Formerly NACURE XC-C207 Alkyl Acid Phosphate Catalyst", King Industries, (20171221), page 1, XP055764910 | - Anonymous, "Product Data Sheet: NACURE® 5076 Strong Acid Catalyst", King Industries, (20171222), page 1, XP055764913 | - Anonymous, "Sicherheitsdatenblatt WorléeAdd 2110", Worlée, (20200204), pages 1 - 10, XP055764915 |