EP3498939 - CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH P.O. Box 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stockel, Markus Schraeger Weg 6 48282 Emsdetten / DE | 02 /
Lang, Johannes Zur Hohen Strasse 8 35075 Gladenbach / DE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 18211216.9 | 10.12.2018 | [2019/25] | Priority number, date | DE201710222452 | 12.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017222452 | [2019/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498939 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04H7/04, F24H1/18, F28D20/00 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
E04H7/04 (EP);
F28D1/06 (EP);
F28D20/0034 (EP);
F24H1/181 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER | [2019/25] | English: | CONTAINER | [2019/25] | French: | RÉCIPIENT | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE1137848 (FRIEDRICH WALTER) [X] 1-3,5-8,14 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 9-11; | [XI]FR2472513 (DIETRICH & CIE DE [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,12-14 * page 1, lines 4-13; figure 3; claims 1,3 * [I] 10,11; | [XI]US2014138389 (ALLEN BRUCE [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * figures 1,2,3,7; claim 1 *[I] 10,11; | [XI]WO2014131093 (ACV INTERNAT [BE]) [X] 1-7,12-14 * page 14, lines 9-16; figures 2,3,6-12; claim 1 * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 3 * [I] 8-11; | [XI]WO2017177279 (SELECT WATER TANKS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * figures 3,4; claim 1 * [I] 10,11 |