EP3667813 - RADAR SENSOR WITH INTEGRATED ANTENNA AND FOCUSSING LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states indie Semiconductor FFO GmbH Im Technologiepark 1 15236 Frankfurt (Oder) / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/40] | For all designated states Indie Semiconductor FFO GmbH Im Technologiepark 1 15236 Frankfurt (Oder) / DE | ||
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states Silicon Radar GmbH Im Technologiepark 1 15236 Frankfurt (Oder) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKLER, Wolfgang Pflaumenallee 50 15234 Frankfurt (Oder) / DE | 02 /
GENSCHOW, Dieter Möllenstr. 22 15378 Rüdersdorf / DE | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/25] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18211440.5 | 10.12.2018 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667813 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3667813 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/06, H01Q15/23, H01Q15/08, H01Q23/00, H01Q1/22, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/32, H01L23/66 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H01Q19/062 (EP);
H01L23/66 (EP);
H01Q1/225 (EP);
H01Q1/2283 (EP);
H01Q1/241 (EP);
H01Q1/3208 (EP);
H01Q15/08 (EP);
H01Q15/23 (EP);
H01Q23/00 (EP);
H01L2223/6677 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | H01Q1/22, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/32, H01Q15/08, H01Q15/23, H01Q19/06, H01Q23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RADARSENSOR MIT INTEGRIERTER ANTENNE UND FOKUSSIERENDER LINSE | [2020/25] | English: | RADAR SENSOR WITH INTEGRATED ANTENNA AND FOCUSSING LENS | [2020/25] | French: | CAPTEUR RADAR AVEC ANTENNE INTÉGRÉE ET LENTILLE DE FOCALISATION | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 03.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | MC | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SK | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6590544 (FILIPOVIC DANIEL [US]) [Y] 8,10 * column 11, lines 64-67; figure 19 * * column 12, lines 40-50 * * column 13, lines 1-6 *[A] 1-7,9,11-16; | [XYI]US2005093738 (NAGASAKU TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,9,11,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0014] , [ 0036] , [ 0041] - [0044]; figures 6, 12 * [Y] 8,15,16 [I] 2; | [XYI]US2014077995 (ARTEMENKO ALEKSEY ANDREEVICH [RU], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,14 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0020] - [0026] - [ 0032] , [ 0037] , [ 0032] - [0038] - [ 0052] - [0061]; figures 1,2,6,7 * [Y] 1-4,6-8,10-16 [I] 4,5,11-13; | [Y]US2016200276 (DIEWALD ANDREAS [DE]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1a, 1b *; | [Y]US2016352437 (WELLE ROLAND [DE], et al) [Y] 16 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0069] , [ 0070] , [ 0074]; figures 6,8 *; | [YA]DE102016120665 (SILICON RADAR GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6-8,10-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0016] , [ 0024] - [0031] - [ 0048] - [0060] - [ 0083] - [0086]; figures 1-4,10 * [A] 9 | Examination | US2015280327 |