EP3502439 - HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AN AIRCRAFT ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHACHT, Michael c/o Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | 02 /
BLUMRICH, Markus c/o Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 18211615.2 | 11.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | DE201710223433 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017223433 | [2019/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502439 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/12, F02C7/224 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
F02C7/12 (EP,US);
F02C7/14 (US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02C7/18 (US);
F02C7/224 (EP,US);
F02K3/06 (US);
F28D7/0066 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2260/213 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FLUGZEUGTRIEBWERK | [2019/26] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AN AIRCRAFT ENGINE | [2019/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR UN MOTEUR D'AVION | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 18.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2731239 (ANDERSEN SOREN K) [X] 1-7,9,10,14 * figures 1-10 * * column 1, line 8 - line 55 * * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 46 - line 63 * * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 45 * * column 7, line 3 - line 26 * * column 8, line 1 - line 22 * [A] 11-13,15 [I] 8; | [XAI]EP2085599 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9,11,14 * figures 1a-2b * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0007] , [0019] - [0024] * [A] 12,13,15 [I] 3-8,10; | [XAI]EP2085600 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9,11,14 * figures 1a-4c * * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] * [A] 12,13,15 [I] 3-8,10 |