EP3499395 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND METHOD OF PROCESSING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIBORI, Hiroki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/38] |
Former [2019/25] | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18211719.2 | 11.12.2018 | [2019/25] | Priority number, date | JP20170242180 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017242180 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3499395 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3499395 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/10, H04N1/00 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
G06F21/105 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F3/1203 (US);
G06F3/1231 (US);
G06F3/1232 (US);
H04N1/00411 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | G06F21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNG | [2019/25] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND METHOD OF PROCESSING INFORMATION | [2019/25] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 02.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22195923.2 / EP4123482 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2018 | AL | 21.09.2022 | AT | 21.09.2022 | BG | 21.09.2022 | CY | 21.09.2022 | CZ | 21.09.2022 | DK | 21.09.2022 | EE | 21.09.2022 | ES | 21.09.2022 | FI | 21.09.2022 | HR | 21.09.2022 | IT | 21.09.2022 | LT | 21.09.2022 | LV | 21.09.2022 | MC | 21.09.2022 | MK | 21.09.2022 | MT | 21.09.2022 | PL | 21.09.2022 | RO | 21.09.2022 | RS | 21.09.2022 | SE | 21.09.2022 | SI | 21.09.2022 | SK | 21.09.2022 | SM | 21.09.2022 | TR | 21.09.2022 | IE | 11.12.2022 | LU | 11.12.2022 | NO | 21.12.2022 | GR | 22.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | IS | 21.01.2023 | PT | 23.01.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 11.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
BG | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
MK | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
TR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
MK | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
TR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 11.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MK | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 11.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 11.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1965330 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 1-11* figures 21,22 *; | [X]US2010242117 (TSUBOI MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0024] , [0060] - [0063]; figures 3,4a *; | [Y]EP2966584 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0066] - [0067]; example 23 * | by applicant | JP2017083982 |