EP3511338 - CARRIER FOR TARGETING NERVE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipsen Bioinnovation Limited 102 Park Drive Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUMMEL, Andreas Postfach Bandelstr. 13b 30171 Hannover / DE | 02 /
WEIL, Tanja Bardiliweg 8 70186 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
GUTCAITS, Aleksandrs c/o Latvian Institute of Organic Synthesis 21 Aizkraukles St 1006 Riga / LV | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Gregson, Anna Louise, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | Gregson, Anna Louise, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18212034.5 | 26.04.2006 | [2019/29] | Priority number, date | DE20051019302 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005019302 | [2019/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3511338 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3511338 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/195, C07K14/33, A61K38/00 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
C12N9/52 (EP,US);
C07K14/195 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
C07K14/33 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2019/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CARRIER ZUM TARGETING VON NERVENZELLEN | [2019/29] | English: | CARRIER FOR TARGETING NERVE CELLS | [2019/29] | French: | PORTEUR DESTINE A CIBLER DES CELLULES NERVEUSES | [2019/29] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 21.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06724595.1 / EP1874803 | EP10011509.6 / EP2345666 | EP17154062.8 / EP3181578 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003215468 (WILLIAMS JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-15* SEQ ID NOs: 40 and 77;; examples 35,49 *; | [I] - WILLEMS A ET AL, "Sequence of the gene coding for the neurotoxin of Clostridium botulinum type A associated with infant botulism: comparison with other clostridial neurotoxins", RESEARCH IN MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1993), vol. 144, no. 7, ISSN 0923-2508, pages 547 - 556, XP002350001 [I] 1-15 * Positions 1255 and 1256 of the amino acid sequence shown in Figure 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-2508(93)90004-L | [I] - RUMMEL A ET AL, "The Hcc-domain of botulinum neurotoxins A and B exhibits a singular ganglioside binding site displaying serotype specific carbohydrate interaction", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC, OXFORD, GB, (20031215), vol. 51, no. 3, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 631 - 643, XP002363868 [I] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2958.2003.03872.x | [I] - HUTSON R A ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF THE GENE CODING FOR NON-PROTEOLYTIC CLOSTRIDIUM BOTULINUM TYPE B NEUROTOXIN: COMPARISO WITH OTHER CLOSTRIDIAL NEUROTOXINS", CURRENT MICROBIOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1994), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0343-8651, pages 101 - 110, XP001079475 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01569055 | by applicant | WO2006002707 | - SHONE et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (19850000), vol. 151, pages 75 - 82 | - GIMENEZ et al., J. Protein Chem., (19930000), vol. 12, pages 351 - 363 | - HALPEM et al., Curr Top Microbiol Immunol, (19930000), vol. 195, pages 221 - 241 | - LACY et al., Nat. Struct. Biol., (19980000), vol. 5, pages 898 - 902 | - HERREROS et al., Biochem. J., (20000000), vol. 347, pages 199 - 204 | - RUMMEL et al., Mol. Microbiol., (20040000), vol. 51, pages 631 - 643 | - RUMMEL et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, pages 30865 - 70 | - BENECKE et al., Akt. Neurol., (19950000), vol. 22, page 209ff | - SYCHA et al., J. Neurol., (20040000), vol. 251, pages 19 - 30 | - HABERMANN et al., Naunyn Schmiedeberg's Arch. Pharmacol., (19800000), vol. 311, pages 33 - 40 | - GÖSCHEL H; WOHLFARTH K; FREVERT J; DENGLER R; BIGALKE H, "Botulinum A toxin therapy: neutralizing and nonneutralizing antibodies--therapeutic consequences", Exp. Neurol., (19970900), vol. 147, no. l, pages 96 - 102 | - HALPERN et al., Curr. Top. Microbiol. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 195, pages 221 - 41 | - BINZ et al., Biochemistry, (20020000), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 1717 - 23 |