EP3505889 - MEASURING PATH DELAY THROUGH A LIQUID-CRYSTAL VARIABLE RETARDER AT NON-UNIFORM RETARDANCE INTERVALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated Office of General Counsel Intellectual Property Law Department Attn: IP Documentation Center 800 Phillips Road, MS 105-20C Webster NY New York 14580 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated Office of General Counsel Intellectual Property Law Department Attn: IP Documentation Center 800 Phillips Road, MS 105-20C Webster, NY 14580 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEGYI, Alex 188 Winfield St. Apt 4 San Francisco, CA California 94110 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 18212123.6 | 12.12.2018 | [2019/27] | Priority number, date | US201715858609 | 29.12.2017 Original published format: US201715858609 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505889 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/453, G01J3/28 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
G01J3/2823 (EP,US);
G01J9/02 (KR);
G01N21/45 (US);
G01J3/4531 (EP,US);
G01J3/4537 (EP,US);
G01M11/02 (CN);
G01N21/21 (US);
G02F1/1313 (CN);
G02F1/13306 (CN);
G02F1/1393 (US);
G02F1/1395 (KR);
G01J2009/0223 (KR);
G01N2201/0683 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSUNG DER PFADVERZÖGERUNG DURCH EINEN VARIABLEN FLÜSSIGKRISTALLVERZÖGERERS BEI UNGLEICHMÄSSIGEN VERZÖGERUNGSINTERVALLEN | [2019/27] | English: | MEASURING PATH DELAY THROUGH A LIQUID-CRYSTAL VARIABLE RETARDER AT NON-UNIFORM RETARDANCE INTERVALS | [2019/27] | French: | MESURE DU RETARD DE TRAJET À TRAVERS UN RETARDATEUR VARIABLE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES À INTERVALLES DE RETARDEMENT NON UNIFORMES | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 03.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015369667 (ROBINSON IAN S [US], et al); | [XYI]EP3015832 (PALO ALTO RES CT INC [US]) |