EP3499249 - ELECTRONIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUBAYASHI, Noriaki c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome KARIYA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Hisaki c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome KARIYA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
FUJITA, Noriaki c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome KARIYA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 448-8650 / JP | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 18212166.5 | 13.12.2018 | [2019/25] | Priority number, date | JP20170239954 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017239954 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3499249 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/20 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
G01R15/202 (EP,CN);
G01R19/0092 (CN);
G01R15/207 (EP);
H05K2201/09063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTE | [2019/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC COMPONENT | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 28.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3545074 (OTTO MAIER VERLAG GMBH [DE]); | [XA]EP0867725 (NANA ELECTRONICS CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2013024851 | JP2014139556 | JP2016031304 |