EP3503156 - CONTACTOR COMPRISING A PLUGGABLE COIL TERMINAL AND A SEAL COVER AND A METHOD FOR INSTALLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/26] | A PLUGGABLE COIL TERMINAL FOR USE WITH A CONTACTOR AND ITS INSTALLATION METHOD | ||
[2024/08] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Electrical Ltd. No. 2 Louyang Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215121 / CN | [2024/31] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Eaton Electrical Ltd. No. 2 Louyang Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215121 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Luming No. 2 Louyang Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215121 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Zhenbo No. 2 Louyang Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215121 / CN | 03 /
PING, Guoyong No. 2 Louyang Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215121 / CN | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2024/31] |
Former [2019/26] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18212819.9 | 14.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | CN201711399350 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711399350 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503156 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3503156 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/44, H01H50/14, // H01R9/24, H01R4/30, H01R13/44, H01R13/627 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H01H50/443 (EP,CN);
H01H49/00 (CN);
H01H50/14 (EP);
H01R9/2491 (EP);
H01R13/113 (EP);
H01R13/5213 (EP);
H01R13/6271 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | SCHÜTZ MIT EINER STECKBAREN SPULENKLEMME UND EINEM DICHTUNGSDECKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBAU | [2024/08] | English: | CONTACTOR COMPRISING A PLUGGABLE COIL TERMINAL AND A SEAL COVER AND A METHOD FOR INSTALLING | [2024/08] | French: | CONTACTEUR COMPRENANT UNE BORNE DE BOBINE ENFICHABLE ET UN COUVERCLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET UN PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION | [2024/08] |
Former [2019/26] | ANSCHLUSSSTECKER FÜR DIE SPULE EINES SCHALTSCHÜTZES UND ANSTECKVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2019/26] | A PLUGGABLE COIL TERMINAL FOR USE WITH A CONTACTOR AND ITS INSTALLATION METHOD | ||
Former [2019/26] | TERMINAL À BOBINE ENFICHABLE POUR UTILISATION AVEC UN CONTACTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION | Examination procedure | 14.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2024 | 18.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008106362 (PORTIER ALAIN [FR]) |