EP3502644 - LEAK TESTING METHODS FOR TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tognetti, Michele Fraz. Torre del Lago Puccini Via XX Settembre 47/B 55049 Viareggio (LU) / IT | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 18213319.9 | 18.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | IT20170146627 | 19.12.2017 Original published format: IT201700146627 | [2019/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502644 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502644 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/32 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G01M3/3272 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LECKAGETESTMETHODEN FÜR TANKS | [2019/26] | English: | LEAK TESTING METHODS FOR TANKS | [2019/26] | French: | METHODES D'ESSAI DE FUITE POUR RESERVOIRS | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2018 | AL | 03.11.2021 | AT | 03.11.2021 | CY | 03.11.2021 | CZ | 03.11.2021 | DK | 03.11.2021 | EE | 03.11.2021 | FI | 03.11.2021 | HR | 03.11.2021 | LT | 03.11.2021 | LV | 03.11.2021 | MK | 03.11.2021 | PL | 03.11.2021 | RO | 03.11.2021 | RS | 03.11.2021 | SI | 03.11.2021 | SK | 03.11.2021 | SM | 03.11.2021 | BG | 03.02.2022 | NO | 03.02.2022 | IS | 03.03.2022 | PT | 03.03.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.12.2018 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 03.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2011153232 (ITO TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0072] * * figure 1 * [Y] 7,8,11,12[I] 3-5; | [XYI]DE102013020388 (TESAT SPACECOM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [ 0102] * * figure 1 * [Y] 7,8,11,12 [I] 3-6,10 |