EP3503506 - LONG POLLING FOR CLUSTERED APPLICATION LOAD BALANCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Inc. 4655 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054-1233 / US | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISHRA, Amit 16718 Prospect Lane Broomfield, Colorado 80023 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMSON, Matt 901 Route 199 Red Hook, New York 12571 / US | 03 /
EZELL, Joel 13883 Dogleg Lane Broomfield, Colorado 80023 / US | 04 /
HASERODT, Kurt 4860 W. 102nd Place Westminster, Colorado 80031 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 18213833.9 | 19.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | US201715847211 | 19.12.2017 Original published format: US201715847211 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503506 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/1004 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANGE ABFRAGE ZUM LASTAUSGLEICH FÜR GRUPPIERTE ANWENDUNG | [2019/26] | English: | LONG POLLING FOR CLUSTERED APPLICATION LOAD BALANCING | [2019/26] | French: | LONG SONDAGE POUR ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE D'APPLICATION DE REGROUPEMENT | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 06.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/07] | 06.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2012185561 (KLEIN MIKAEL [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * figures 2-3 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0068] * [Y] 5-8,13-15 [I] 3,11; | [Y]US2016028688 (CHIZHOV VLADIMIR YURIEVICH [RU], et al) [Y] 7,8,15 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]US2016072729 (SASIN SZYMON [FI], et al) [Y] 5,6,13,14 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0082] * |