EP3502203 - SELF-ADHESIVE FOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regu GmbH & Co. KG Paul-Gossen-Str. 114 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTUNG, Florian Mainstr. 2 91052 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KOENIG, Ralf Johannisstr. 62 90419 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Wetterkreuz 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 18214371.9 | 20.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | DE201710131082 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017131082 | [2019/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502203 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/38, C09J11/08, C09J133/04 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
C09J7/385 (EP);
C09J11/08 (EP);
C09J133/04 (EP);
C09J2301/122 (EP);
C09J2301/414 (EP);
C09J2400/226 (EP);
C09J2433/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J2433/00, C09J2433/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/05] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTKLEBENDE FOLIE | [2019/26] | English: | SELF-ADHESIVE FOIL | [2019/26] | French: | FEUILLE AUTO-ADHÉSIVE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/05] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9513327 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 4 * * page 16, lines 5,6; examples 45-47 *; | [X]US2017081557 (SHIGETOMI KIYOE [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0111]; examples 1,2,5,7; claims 1,4 *; | [XP]WO2018152469 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [XP] 1-10 * abstract ** page 11, line 9 - line 21; examples 3,4,7,C2,C3,C6,C9; tables 1,2 * |