EP3486677 - POSITIONING GAP INDICATION FOR ENHANCING POSITIONING PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/14] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siomina, Iana Mäster Simons Väg 20, D41 170 66 Solna / SE | 02 /
Kazmi, Muhammad Skrivargatan 7 174 64 Sundbyberg / SE | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 18214549.0 | 04.04.2012 | [2019/21] | Priority number, date | US201161471303P | 04.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161471303 P | US201213438305 | 03.04.2012 Original published format: US201213438305 | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486677 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3486677 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/10, G01S5/02, H04W4/02, H04W24/10, // H04W64/00 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
G01S5/0205 (EP,US);
G01S5/10 (EP,US);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER POSITIONIERUNGSLÜCKENANGABE ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER POSITIONIERUNGSLEISTUNG | [2019/21] | English: | POSITIONING GAP INDICATION FOR ENHANCING POSITIONING PERFORMANCE | [2019/21] | French: | UTILISATION D'INDICATION D'ESPACE DE POSITIONNEMENT POUR AMÉLIORER LA PERFORMANCE DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2019/21] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 22.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12717492.8 / EP2695419 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.04.2020 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | IE | 04.04.2020 | LU | 04.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010124899 (SHI GUANGMING CARL [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0007] *; | [A]US2010323633 (PANI DIANA [CA], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0007] , [0053] *; | [XI] - ERICSSON ET AL, "measurement gap configuration for inter-freq RSTD measurement", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-106464 INTER-FREQ RSTD, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101109), vol. RAN WG2, no. Jacksonville, USA; 20101115, XP050467156 [X] 1 * pages 1-2 * [I] 1,2 | [XI] - CATT ET AL, "Introduction of OTDOA inter-freq RSTD measurement indication procedure", 3GPP DRAFT; 36331_CR0602R1_(REL-10)_R2-111692, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110306), vol. RAN WG2, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221, XP050494114 [X] 1 * pages 1-4 * [I] 1,2 | [A] - NOKIA, "Introduction of LCS QoS Class and indication of achieved accuracy", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-040457, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20040517), vol. RAN WG2, no. Montreal, Canada; 20040517, XP050126073 [A] 1,2 * paragraph [9.1.7] * | [A] - ERICSSON ET AL, "Requirements for reporting criteria with positioning measurements", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-111692 CR36133 REQUIREMENTS FOR REPORTING CRITERIA WITH POSITIONING MEASUREMENTS REL-10, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110311), vol. RAN WG4, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221 - 20110225, XP050612544 [A] 1,2 * page Cover - paragraph 8.2.1 * |