EP3671255 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE LOCATION OF A PLURALITY OF TARGETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FREQUENTIS COMSOFT GmbH Wachhausstraße 5a 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie (KIT) Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANEBECK, Uwe Karlsruher Institut für Technologie (KIT) Kiefernweg 10 76337 Waldbronn / DE | 02 /
FRISCH, Daniel Karlsruher Institut für Technologie (KIT) Luisenstraße 99 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
NOACK, Benjamin Karlsruher Institut für Technologie (KIT) Moltkestraße 149 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
SHARPLES, Mike Frequentis Comsoft GmbH Jaegersteig 25 76297 Stutensee / DE | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18214798.3 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3671255 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14, // G01S5/16, G01S5/30 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
G01S5/145 (EP);
G01S5/16 (EP);
G01S5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINER VIELZAHL VON ZIELEN | [2020/26] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE LOCATION OF A PLURALITY OF TARGETS | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER L'EMPLACEMENT D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE CIBLES | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 11.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6704692 (BANERJEE SUBHANKAR [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2005017555 (SENSIS CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 26 - page 30; figure 11 *; | [AD]US2008111730 (DING ZHEN [CA], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - WANG JIE-GUI ET AL, "Passive tracking based on data association with information fusion of multi-feature and multi-target", NEURAL NETWORKS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 I NTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NANJING, CHINA DEC. 14-17, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031214), doi:10.1109/ICNNSP.2003.1279367, ISBN 978-0-7803-7702-8, pages 686 - 689Vol.1, XP032190450 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICNNSP.2003.1279367 | by applicant | US5454720 | US6704692 | US7132982 | US2008111730 |