EP3505935 - METHOD FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF A BORNA VIRUS INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROIMMUN Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG Seekamp 31 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG Seekamp 31 23560 Lübeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lattwein, Erik Kaninchenbergweg 1e 23564 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Wolfgang Ahornallee 42a 23689 Pansdorf / DE | 03 /
Schlumberger, Wolfgang Fuchsbau 4 23627 Groß Grönau / DE | 04 /
Janz, Julia Waldweg 3 22929 Schönberg / DE | 05 /
Ott, Anthonina Moorwiesen 24 23847 Schiphorst / DE | 06 /
Scheper, Thomas Teichweg 5 23919 Berkenthin / DE | 07 /
Schmidt-Chanasit, Jonas Invalidenstraße 124 10115 Berlin / DE | 08 /
Tappe, Dennis Hartwig-Hesse-Str. 13 20257 Hamburg / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 18214997.1 | 21.12.2018 | [2019/27] | Priority number, date | EP20170211138 | 29.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17211138 | [2019/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505935 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3505935 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, G01N33/543 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
G01N33/56983 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/543 (EP,US);
G01N33/563 (KR);
G01N33/6893 (KR);
G01N2333/08 (US);
G01N2469/10 (US);
G01N2800/52 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE EINER BORNAVIRUS-INFEKTION | [2019/27] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF A BORNA VIRUS INFECTION | [2019/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE INFECTION AUX VIRUS DE LA MALADIE DE BORNA | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 02.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | IT | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9818457 (LUDWIG HANNS [DE], et al) [I] 15 * siehe Ansprüche *; | [XY]WO9830238 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US]) [X] 1,4-8,11,12,14 * siehe S. 1, 4, 6-7, 57-84, 104-105 * [Y] 2,3,9,10,13; | [X]JPH11180998 (EISAI CO LTD) [X] 1,4-8,12,14 * [0005] *; | [X]WO9934216 (LUDWIG HANNS [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-8,11,12,14 * siehe S. 13-17 *; | [Y]US2009155261 (DALMAU JOSEP [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,9,10,13 * siehe Ansprüche *; | [Y]US2013072582 (DALMAU JOSEP [US]) [Y] 2,3,9,10,13 * siehe Ansprüche *; | [A] - Q. LI ET AL, "Detection and analysis of Borna disease virus in Chinese patients with neurological disorders", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGY, GB, (20090301), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1468-1331.2008.02516.x, ISSN 1351-5101, pages 399 - 403, XP055466461 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1468-1331.2008.02516.x | [A] - MATSUNAGA H ET AL, "Isotype analysis of human anti-Borna disease virus antibodies in Japanese psychiatric and general population", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 43, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JCV.2008.07.011, ISSN 1386-6532, (20081101), pages 317 - 322, (20080910), XP025612281 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcv.2008.07.011 | [A] - BERND HOFFMANN ET AL, "A Variegated Squirrel Bornavirus Associated with Fatal Human Encephalitis", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, THE - NEJM -, US, (20150709), vol. 373, no. 2, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1415627, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 154 - 162, XP055466467 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1415627 | Examination | - Heng-Thay Chong ET AL, "Treatment of acute Nipah encephalitis with ribavirin", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY., BOSTON, US, (20010601), vol. 49, no. 6, doi:10.1002/ana.1062, ISSN 0364-5134, pages 810 - 813, XP055705425 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.1062 | - HORNIG M ET AL, "Absence of evidence for bornavirus infection in schizophrenia, bipolar disorder and major depressive disorder", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP UK, LONDON, vol. 17, no. 5, doi:10.1038/MP.2011.179, ISSN 1359-4184, (20120131), pages 486 - 493, (20120131), XP037789777 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mp.2011.179 | - IAN LIPKIN W ET AL, "Borna disease virus Fact and fantasy", VIRUS RESEARCH, vol. 162, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VIRUSRES.2011.09.036, ISSN 0168-1702, (20111231), pages 162 - 172, (20110929), XP028115835 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virusres.2011.09.036 | - Dürrwald R. ET AL, "Meta-analysis of putative human Bornavirus...", (20071231), URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/rmv.530, (20220803), XP055948774 | - MELZER NICO ET AL, "Limbic Encephalitis: Potential Impact of Adaptive Autoimmune Inflammation on Neuronal Circuits of the Amygdala", FRONTIERS IN NEUROLOGY, (20150803), vol. 6, doi:10.3389/fneur.2015.00171, XP055948775 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fneur.2015.00171 | - DENNIS TAPPE ET AL, "Occupation-Associated Fatal Limbic Encephalitis Caused by Variegated Squirrel Bornavirus 1, Germany, 2013", EMERGING INFECTIOUS DISEASES, US, (20180601), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.3201/eid2406.172027, ISSN 1080-6040, pages 978 - 987, XP055705298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3201/eid2406.172027 |