EP3670597 - FIBER REINFORCED POLYCARBONATE AND COPOLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED COLOR STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHPP Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2021/14] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Micciche, Fabrizio Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | 02 /
Günbas, Duygu Deniz Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | 03 /
van de Grampel, Robert Dirk Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | 04 /
van der Mee, Mark Adrianus Johannes Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | 05 /
Goossens, Johannes Martinus Dina Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18215058.1 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670597 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3670597 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/02, C08K5/42 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C08K7/02 (EP);
C08J5/08 (CN);
C08L69/00 (US);
C08G64/04 (US);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K5/42 (EP,CN,US);
C08K7/14 (CN,US);
C08K9/08 (US);
C08L27/18 (US);
C08L83/04 (US);
C08J2369/00 (CN);
C08J2425/12 (CN);
C08J2427/18 (CN);
C08K13/06 (CN);
C08K2003/2241 (CN,US);
C08K2003/329 (US);
C08K5/103 (CN);
C08K5/3475 (CN);
C08K5/526 (CN);
C08K9/10 (CN);
C08L2201/08 (US);
C08L2203/16 (US);
C08L2203/30 (US);
C08L2205/02 (US);
C08L2207/04 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/42, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08K7/02, C08L69/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FASERVERSTÄRKTE POLYCARBONAT- UND COPOLYCARBONATZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER FARBSTABILITÄT | [2020/26] | English: | FIBER REINFORCED POLYCARBONATE AND COPOLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED COLOR STABILITY | [2020/26] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYCARBONATE ET DE COPOLYCARBONATE RENFORCÉES DE FIBRES PRÉSENTANT UNE MEILLEURE STABILITÉ DE COULEUR | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | MC | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | LU | 21.12.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
IT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SK | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7462662 (BALFOUR KIM G [US], et al); | [X]WO2013076636 (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL]) | by applicant | EP0524731 | WO2013175448 | WO2014072923 | US2014295363 |